EP3773931 - NOVEL COMPOSITION COMPRISING POLYCAFEOYLQUINIC ACIDS, COSMETIC USE THEREOF AND COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/07] | NOVEL COMPOSITION BASED ON POLYCAFFEOYLQUINIC ACIDS, THE USE THEREOF IN COSMETICS AND COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SAME | ||
[2024/28] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société d'Exploitation de Produits pour les Industries Chimiques SEPPIC 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERN, Catherine c/o SEPPIC 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 PARIS CEDEX 07 / FR | 02 /
GARCIA, Christine 38, rue du Commandant Prat PC11056 81100 CASTRES / FR | 03 /
GOMBERT, Christian C/O SEPPIC 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 PARIS CEDEX 07 / FR | 04 /
MSIKA, Philippe C/O SEPPIC 75 Quai d'Orsay PARIS CEDEX 07 PARIS / FR | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19726044.1 | 10.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019FR50840 | Priority number, date | FR20180053224 | 12.04.2018 Original published format: FR 1853224 | [2021/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019197777 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3773931 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/00, A61P17/16, A61K8/37, A61K8/9789, A61K36/28 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
A61Q19/007 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/365 (KR);
A61K8/375 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/19 (KR);
A61K31/192 (KR);
A61K31/216 (KR,US);
A61K31/22 (KR);
A61K36/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/345 (KR);
A61K8/37 (KR);
A61K8/9789 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/00 (KR);
A61K2236/00 (EP);
A61K2236/10 (US);
A61K2236/30 (KR);
A61K2236/35 (US);
A61K2800/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | NEUE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND POLYCAFEOYLQUININSÄUREN, IHRE KOSMETISCHE VERWENDUNG UND SIE ENTHALTENDE KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSEZUNGEN | [2024/28] | English: | NOVEL COMPOSITION COMPRISING POLYCAFEOYLQUINIC ACIDS, COSMETIC USE THEREOF AND COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING IT | [2024/28] | French: | NOUVELLE COMPOSITION À BASE D'ACIDES POLYCAFÉOYLQUINIQUES, SON UTILISATION EN COSMÉTIQUE ET COMPOSITIONS COSMÉTIQUES EN COMPRENANT | [2021/07] |
Former [2021/07] | NEUE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF BASIS VON POLYKAFFEOYLCHINASÄUREN, IHRE VERWENDUNG IN KOSMETIKA UND KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAMIT | ||
Former [2021/07] | NOVEL COMPOSITION BASED ON POLYCAFFEOYLQUINIC ACIDS, THE USE THEREOF IN COSMETICS AND COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SAME | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 12.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CN106074663 ; | [X]US8481480 (LAM UYEN T [US], et al); | [X]WO2017129779 (EXPANSCIENCE LAB [FR]); | by applicant | WO9426694 | WO9809611 | EP0977626 | WO2005040230 | CN104304955 | CN105232438 | CN106074663 | CN107157800 |