EP3803715 - ACQUIRING ENTITY WEBPAGE LINK BASED ON TOPOLOGICAL RELATIONSHIP GRAPH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SU, Bai MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
MA, Chao MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
ZHOU, Changhai MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
HUA, Shujun MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
LU, Yuan MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
WEN, Ning MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19726277.7 | 13.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019US31915 | Priority number, date | CN201810516375 | 25.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810516375 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019226371 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3803715 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06N5/02 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
G06N5/022 (EP,US);
G06F16/9024 (US);
G06F16/953 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERFASSUNG EINER ENTITÄTSWEBSEITENVERKNÜPFUNG AUF DER BASIS EINER TOPOLOGISCHEN BEZIEHUNGSGRAFIK | [2021/15] | English: | ACQUIRING ENTITY WEBPAGE LINK BASED ON TOPOLOGICAL RELATIONSHIP GRAPH | [2021/15] | French: | ACQUISITION DE LIEN DE PAGE WEB D'ENTITÉ SUR LA BASE D'UN GRAPHE DE RELATION TOPOLOGIQUE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 12.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.07.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP3051433 (UNIV PEKING FOUNDER GROUP CO [CN], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0056] ** figures 1-4 * |