Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
14.05.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.04.2021 | Change - applicant | |
12.03.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
12.03.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
12.03.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
22.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.11.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.10.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.10.2020 | Change - representative | |
12.10.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.11.2019 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
30.11.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.06.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication |