Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11403534 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2022 | B2 | US2021191951 | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US31915 | 13.05.2019 | CN201810516375 | 25.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3803715 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US31915 | 13.05.2019 | CN201810516375 | 25.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019226371 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201810516375 | 25.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110598073B | Global Dossier | 26.04.2024 | B | CN110598073 | 20.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201810516375 | 25.05.2018 |