Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3791674
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.05.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.02.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
23.01.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.10.2022 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
11.10.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.10.2022 |
First examination report |
|
27.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.07.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
16.07.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
18.06.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.02.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
12.02.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
12.02.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
20.01.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
09.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|