EP3784346 - A COMPOSITION FOR TREATING ONE OR MORE ESTROGEN RELATED DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LifeArc 7th Floor Lynton House 7-12 Tavistock Square London, Greater London WC1H 9LT / GB | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSEN, Finn 18 Forest Road Bronchester Bridge Hawick TD9 8JS / GB | 02 /
MACLEAN, Carol Marion 25 Balmuir Avenue West Lothian Bathgate EH48 4BW / GB | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19727289.1 | 25.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019EP60570 | Priority number, date | EP20180169419 | 26.04.2018 Original published format: EP 18169419 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019207026 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3784346 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61P5/30, A61K38/09 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
A61P5/30 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K38/09 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P5/32 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | 26.11.2020 | ME | 26.11.2020 | Validation states | KH | 26.11.2020 | MA | 26.11.2020 | MD | 26.11.2020 | TN | 26.11.2020 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER ODER MEHRERER ÖSTROGENVERMITTELTER KRANKHEITEN | [2021/09] | English: | A COMPOSITION FOR TREATING ONE OR MORE ESTROGEN RELATED DISEASES | [2021/09] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR TRAITER UNE OU PLUSIEURS MALADIES LI& XC9;ES AUX & X152;STROG& XC8;NES | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 26.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9520972 (HAMPTON ROADS MEDICAL COLLEGE [US]) [A] 1-12* claims 1,8,13-14 *; | [Y]WO9603138 (HAMPTON ROADS MEDICAL COLLEGE [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 24, lines 2-10,12-13; claims 8,9 * * page 7, line 7 - page 8, line 4 * * page 13, lines 11-14,20-21 *; | [XY]WO0121194 (ASTA MEDICA AG [DE], et al) [X] 12 * page 5, lines 5-9; figures 1,2; claims 1,2,9-13 * * page 6, lines 6-24 * * page 8, lines 27-30 * [Y] 1-11; | [XA]US2002177556 (ENGEL JURGEN [DE], et al) [X] 12 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006]; claims 1,3-10 * [A] 1-11; | [XY]WO03006049 (FERRING BV [NL], et al) [X] 12 * page 6, paragraph 2; claims 27-31 * [Y] 1-11; | [Y] - Jacques Donnez, "Partial suppression of estradiol: a new strategy in endometriosis management?", Fertility and Sterility, (20170301), pages 568 - 570, URL: https://www.fertstert.org/article/S0015-0282(17)30056-0/pdf, (20180802), XP055497090 [Y] 1-11 * page 568, column 2, paragraphs 18-24 * * last paragraph; page 568 - page 569 * * page 569, column 2, paragraph 2 * |