EP3765697 - MOTORIZED CONTROL DEVICE FOR VEHICLE DOORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bonetto, Claudia B.ta Carlevè Colpastore, 5 10094 Giaveno (TO) / IT | For all designated states Bonetto, Claudio Strada Pianca, 15 10090 Trana (TO) / IT | For all designated states Bonetto, Paola Strada Pianca, 15 10090 Trana (TO) / IT | For all designated states Pampolini, Oriana Strada Pianca, 15 10090 Trana (TO) / IT | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 19727511.8 | 29.04.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019IB53489 | Priority number, date | IT20180003561 | 14.03.2018 Original published format: IT201800003561 | [2021/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019175857 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3765697 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3765697 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/643 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
E05F15/643 (EP);
E05Y2201/214 (EP);
E05Y2201/246 (EP);
E05Y2201/462 (EP);
E05Y2400/3013 (EP);
E05Y2900/531 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTORISIERTE STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGTÜREN | [2021/03] | English: | MOTORIZED CONTROL DEVICE FOR VEHICLE DOORS | [2021/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE MOTORISÉ POUR PORTIÈRES DE VÉHICULE | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2019 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 28.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 28.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 21.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4640050 (YAMAGISHI JUN [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 54; figures 1-3 *; | [XAI]US5794381 (RIZKOVSKY ROY R [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 56 - column 7, line 9; figures 1-8 * [A] 2,5-10 [I] 3,4; | [A]US6092336 (WRIGHT KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 10-56; figures 2,3 * |