Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3709666
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.02.2022 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
22.10.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
21.10.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.08.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.04.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.04.2021 |
First examination report |
|
15.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.11.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.08.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
28.08.2020 |
Change - inventor |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
14.08.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
14.08.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
08.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
27.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
06.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|