EP3709666 - METHOD FOR FITTING TARGET OBJECT IN VIDEO FRAME, SYSTEM, AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wangsu Science & Technology Co., Ltd. Building A Floor 5 Guangqi Culture Plaza 2899 Xietu Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200030 / CN | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Lei Building A Floor 5, GuangQi Culture Plaza No. 2899 Jia Xietu Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200030 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Fenglei Building A Floor 5, GuangQi Culture Plaza No. 2899 Jia Xietu Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200030 / CN | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Raynor, Simon Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/38] | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19727579.5 | 06.03.2019 | [2020/38] | WO2019CN77236 | Priority number, date | CN201910105682 | 01.02.2019 Original published format: CN201910105682 | [2020/38] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020155299 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3709666 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/44, G06K9/00, G06T7/12, G06T7/60, H04N21/431, H04N21/435, H04N21/4545 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
H04N21/23418 (EP);
H04N21/44008 (CN);
G06F18/214 (CN);
H04N21/4312 (CN);
H04N21/4318 (EP);
H04N21/435 (EP);
H04N21/4545 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINBRINGEN EINES ZIELOBJEKTS IN EINEM VIDEOFRAME | [2020/38] | English: | METHOD FOR FITTING TARGET OBJECT IN VIDEO FRAME, SYSTEM, AND DEVICE | [2020/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AJUSTEMENT D'UN OBJET CIBLE DANS UNE TRAME VIDÉO, SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIF | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2019 | Translation filed | 10.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2019 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 18.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014285485 (JIAN PEIYUN [CN], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11,13 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0057] * * figure 2 * * figure 3 * * figure 4 * * figure 5 * * figure 6 * [I] 7,12; | [A]US2017076142 (CHANG JASON [US]) [A] 7,12* paragraph [0005] * | International search | [A]US2015117792 (ITAGAKI SHUSEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13* entire document *; | [A]EP2905738 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * entire document *; | [A]CN106951820 (JIANGSU HUIYAN DATA TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * entire document *; | [Y]CN109173263 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [Y] 2-3, 7, 12 * description, paragraphs 51-52 and 58 *; | [XY]CN109242868 (MEGVII TECH LTD) [X] 1, 4-6, 8-11, 13 * description, paragraphs 70-156 * * description, paragraphs 70-156 * [Y] 2-3, 7, 12 |