EP3802767 - FORMULATIONS, THEIR PREPARATION AND USE AND SUITABLE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/15] | FORMULATIONS, THE PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF, AND SUITABLE COMPONENTS | ||
[2022/14] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANG, Frank-Peter Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
TUERK, Holger Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19727667.8 | 29.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019EP64013 | Priority number, date | EP20180176308 | 06.06.2018 Original published format: EP 18176308 | [2021/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019233864 | Date: | 12.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3802767 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/04, C11D3/37 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
C11D3/046 (EP);
C11D3/3788 (EP,US);
C11D17/003 (US);
C11D3/2086 (US);
C11D3/33 (US);
C11D3/3757 (US);
C11D3/3942 (US);
C11D2111/14 (US);
C11D3/222 (EP);
C11D3/3769 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG, UND GEEIGNETE KOMPONENTEN | [2021/15] | English: | FORMULATIONS, THEIR PREPARATION AND USE AND SUITABLE COMPOUNDS | [2022/14] | French: | FORMULES, LEUR FABRICATION ET UTILISATION AINSI QUE COMPOSANTS ADAPTÉS | [2022/14] |
Former [2021/15] | FORMULATIONS, THE PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF, AND SUITABLE COMPONENTS | ||
Former [2021/15] | FORMULATIONS, LEUR PRÉPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION ET CONSTITUANTS APPROPRIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 11.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/03] | 01.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3852209 (HOFMANN P) [A] 1-13* column 1, line 34 - line 45; examples 8, 12 *; | [A]DE4316743 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * claim - *; | [ID]WO2015197379 (BASF SE [DE]) [ID] 1-13 * page 3, lines 1-6; claims 1-12 *; | [I]WO2015197378 (BASF SE [DE]) [I] 1-13 * page 2, lines 15-20; claim - * | by applicant | EP0851023 | DE19819187 | EP2138560 | WO2015197379 | WO2017186524 |