EP3803367 - ION TRANSPORT DEVICE, ION MOBILITY SPECTROMETER AND ION FUNNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/15] | ION TRANSPORT DEVICE, ION MOBILITY SPECTROMETER, AND MASS SPECTROMETER | ||
[2023/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IE | published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gottfried Wilhelm Leibniz Universität Hannover Welfengarten 1 30167 Hannover / DE | [2023/37] |
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states Gottfried Wilhelm Leibniz Universität Hannover Welfengarten 1 30167 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIMMERMANN, Stefan Reiherweg 11 30938 Burgwedel / DE | 02 /
KIRK, Ansgar Dangersstr. 5 30419 Hannover / DE | 03 /
BOHNHORST, Alexander Falkenstraße 21 30449 Hannover / DE | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Kröncke, Rolf, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Plathnerstraße 3A 30175 Hannover / DE | [2023/37] |
Former [2021/15] | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 19727671.0 | 29.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019EP64029 | Priority number, date | DE201810113331 | 05.06.2018 Original published format: DE102018113331 | [2021/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019233865 | Date: | 12.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3803367 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3803367 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/622, H01J49/06, H05K1/14 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
G01N27/622 (EP,US);
H01J49/022 (US);
H01J49/025 (US);
H01J49/066 (US);
H01J49/065 (EP);
H05K1/14 (EP);
H05K2201/047 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | G01N27/62, H01J49/06, H05K1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IONENTRANSPORTVORRICHTUNG, IONENMOBILITÄTSSPEKTROMETER UND IONENTRICHTER | [2023/16] | English: | ION TRANSPORT DEVICE, ION MOBILITY SPECTROMETER AND ION FUNNEL | [2023/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT IONIQUE, SPECTROMÈTRE DE MOBILITÉ IONIQUE ET ENTONNOIR À IONS | [2023/16] |
Former [2021/15] | IONENTRANSPORTVORRICHTUNG, IONENMOBILITÄTSSPEKTROMETER UND MASSENSPEKTROMETER | ||
Former [2021/15] | ION TRANSPORT DEVICE, ION MOBILITY SPECTROMETER, AND MASS SPECTROMETER | ||
Former [2021/15] | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT D'IONS, SPECTROMÈTRE DE MOBILITÉ IONIQUE ET SPECTROMÈTRE DE MASSE | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 11.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SI | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | IE | 29.05.2024 | LU | 29.05.2024 | BE | 31.05.2024 | [2025/22] |
Former [2025/08] | BG | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SI | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
LU | 29.05.2024 | ||
Former [2025/07] | BG | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SI | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/51] | BG | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SI | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/49] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SI | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US6316768 (ROCKWOOD ALAN L [US], et al); | [A]US2015318156 (LOYD WILLIAM MORGAN [US], et al); | [A]US2017236698 (ZHANG XIAOQIANG [CN], et al); |