|
10.07.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.07.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2023 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.02.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
22.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
07.02.2023 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2021 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2021 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2021 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2020 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
28.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.10.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.09.2020 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.01.2020 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2019 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
08.10.2019 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
08.10.2019 |
Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.05.2019 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.05.2019 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
20 |
|
30.05.2019 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
57 |
|
30.05.2019 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
30.05.2019 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |