EP3797354 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR EXECUTING BUSINESS LOGIC RELATED TO PHYSICAL SPACES AND ASSOCIATED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANCIU, Alina Mihaela MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
VANDENBROUCK, Gregory Christopher John MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
PETRALLI, Andres Carlo MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
VAN HOOF, Hubert MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19727783.3 | 06.05.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019US30797 | Priority number, date | US201815985513 | 21.05.2018 Original published format: US201815985513 | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019226301 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797354 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
G06F9/5072 (EP);
G06Q10/0631 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VON GESCHÄFTSLOGIK IN BEZUG AUF PHYSIKALISCHE RÄUME UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2021/13] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR EXECUTING BUSINESS LOGIC RELATED TO PHYSICAL SPACES AND ASSOCIATED DEVICES | [2021/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES D'EXÉCUTION D'UNE LOGIQUE COMMERCIALE ASSOCIÉE À DES ESPACES PHYSIQUES ET DISPOSITIFS ASSOCIÉS | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 09.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2017083386 (WING AUBREY [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [I] 2-5,7-10 | [XI] - Sanchb1, "INT (x86 instruction)", (20171109), Wikipedia, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=INT_(x86_instruction)&oldid=809423342, (20190627), XP002792443 [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [I] 2-5,7-10 |