EP3827312 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE HEATING STATE OF AN OPTICAL ELEMENT IN AN OPTICAL SYSTEM FOR MICROLITHOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, RO, SK | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss SMT GmbH Rudolf-Eber-Strasse 2 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUNER, Toralf Opalstraße 22 73433 Aalen / DE | 02 /
HARTJES, Joachim Philipp-Funk Str. 32 73433 Aalen / DE | 03 /
HAUF, Markus Hafenberg 4 89075 Ulm / DE | 04 /
BEURER, Gerhard Friedenstrasse 12 89073 Ulm / DE | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Frank, Hartmut, et al Bonsmann Bonsmann Frank Patentanwälte Reichspräsidentenstraße 21-25 45470 Mülheim a. d. Ruhr / DE | [2023/27] |
Former [2021/22] | Frank, Hartmut Bonsmann Bonsmann Frank Patentanwälte Reichspräsidentenstraße 21-25 45470 Mülheim a. d. Ruhr / DE | Application number, filing date | 19727876.5 | 16.05.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019EP62631 | Priority number, date | DE201810212400 | 25.07.2018 Original published format: DE102018212400 | [2021/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020020506 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3827312 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3827312 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/27] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP3827312 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, G02B7/00, G02B7/18, G01J5/08 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
G03F7/70891 (EP,KR,US);
G01J5/0806 (EP,KR,US);
G01J5/0003 (EP);
G01J5/0007 (KR);
G01J5/047 (EP);
G01J5/07 (EP,KR);
G01J5/0831 (EP,KR);
G01J5/084 (EP,KR,US);
G01J5/10 (US);
G02B27/0955 (US);
G02B5/001 (US);
G02B7/008 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN DES ERWÄRMUNGSZUSTANDES EINES OPTISCHEN ELEMENTS IN EINEM OPTISCHEN SYSTEM FÜR DIE MIKROLITHOGRAPHIE | [2021/22] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE HEATING STATE OF AN OPTICAL ELEMENT IN AN OPTICAL SYSTEM FOR MICROLITHOGRAPHY | [2021/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA DÉTERMINATION DE LA CONDITION DE CHAUFFAGE D'UN ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE DANS UN SYSTÈME OPTIQUE POUR LA MICROLITHOGRAPHIE | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 06.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP23156248.9 / EP4212962 | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 05.07.2023 | |
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 05.07.2023 | |
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 05.10.2023 | |
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 05.10.2023 | |
GR | 06.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]JPH02181416 (HITACHI LTD); | [XDA]DE102005004460 (ZEISS CARL SMT AG [DE]); | [A]DE102011081259 (ZEISS CARL SMT GMBH [DE]); | [XA]US2012127440 (MAJOR ANDRAS G [DE]); | [A]DE102018207126 (ZEISS CARL SMT GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE3605737 | DE102005004460 |