EP3807421 - METHOD FOR EARLY DETECTION OF A NECROTIC ENTERITIS OUTBREAK IN AN AVIAN POPULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGWE, Emeka Ignatius Theresienstr. 120 80333 München / DE | 02 /
BÖHL, Florian Am Schänzel 12 60151 Neckargemünd / DE | 03 /
KAPPEL, Andreas Königsteiner Strasse 10a 61479 Glashütten / DE | 04 /
THIEMANN, Frank Heller 38 48031 Nottuln / DE | 05 /
WEISSMANN, Michaela Hagenstrasse 4 32130 Enger / DE | 06 /
WICKER, David L. 2915 Westwood Trail Gainesville, Georgia 30506 / US | 07 /
MARTIN, Ken 1664 Ridgemore Road Toccoa, Georgia 30577 / US | 08 /
MIDDLEBROOKS, Casey 3323 Jackson Bridge Road Carnesville, Georgia 30521 / US | 09 /
TILLEY, Sarah 331 Linwood Drive Demorest, Georgia 30535 / US | 10 /
SMITH, Janet 187 Eastcrest Drive Mount Airy, Georgia 30563 / US | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19728456.5 | 07.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019EP64949 | Priority number, date | US201862685443P | 15.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862685443 P | EP20180179891 | 26.06.2018 Original published format: EP 18179891 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019238561 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3807421 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3807421 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6883, C12Q1/689 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/689 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FRÜHZEITIGEN ERKENNUNG EINES NEKROTISCHEN ENTERITISAUSBRUCHS BEI EINER VOGELPOPULATION | [2023/27] | English: | METHOD FOR EARLY DETECTION OF A NECROTIC ENTERITIS OUTBREAK IN AN AVIAN POPULATION | [2021/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION PRÉCOCE D'UNE ÉPIDÉMIE DE L'ENTÉRITE NÉCROTIQUE DANS UNE POPULATION AVIAIRE | [2023/27] |
Former [2021/16] | VERFAHREN ZUR FRÜHZEITIGEN ERKENNUNG EINES AUSBRUCHS VON NEKROTISCHER ENTERITIS BEI EINER VOGELPOPULATION | ||
Former [2021/16] | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION PRÉCOCE D'UNE FLAMBÉE ÉPIDÉMIQUE D'ENTÉRITE NÉCROTIQUE DANS UNE POPULATION AVIAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 08.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.05.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2016142146 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * p. 2, l. 32 - p. 3, l. 7; p. 13, ll. 18-19; Tables 1-2 *; | [A]CN107090518 (SUZHOU GENEWORKS TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * SEQ ID NO: 65 *; | [XP]WO2018206690 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-12 * the whole document ** p. 3, l. 11 - p. 4, l. 19; p. 7, l. 11; p. 8, l. 16; p. 23, last table; p. 25, last table *; | [A] - MCCOURT M T ET AL, "Sandwich ELISA detection of Clostridium perfringens cells and @a-toxin from field cases of necrotic enteritis of poultry", VETERINARY MICROBIOLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 106, no. 3-4, ISSN 0378-1135, (20050410), pages 259 - 264, (20050410), XP027620380 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * Fig. 1 * | [A] - MERETE HOFSHAGEN ET AL, "Toxin Production by Clostridium perfringens Isolated from Broiler Chickens and Capercaillies (Tetrao urogallus) with and without Necrotizing Enteritis", AVIAN DISEASES., US, (19921001), vol. 36, no. 4, doi:10.2307/1591541, ISSN 0005-2086, page 837, XP055513637 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2307/1591541 | [A] - LEE SUNG HYEN ET AL, "Immune and anti-oxidant effects ofin ovoselenium proteinate on post-hatch experimental avian necrotic enteritis", VETERINARY PARASITOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20141027), vol. 206, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.VETPAR.2014.10.025, ISSN 0304-4017, pages 115 - 122, XP029108216 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * p. 117, col. 1, first para.; Table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vetpar.2014.10.025 | [A] - KYUNGWOO LEE ET AL, "Identification and cloning of two immunogenicproteins, elongation factor Tu (EF-Tu) and pyruvate:ferredoxin oxidoreductase (PFO) of", RESEARCH IN VETERINARY SCIENCE, BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION, LONDON, GB, vol. 91, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.RVSC.2011.01.017, ISSN 0034-5288, (20110120), pages e80 - e86, (20110131), XP028102751 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * Table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.rvsc.2011.01.017 | [A] - JI YOUNG PARK ET AL, "Characterization of Clostridium perfringens isolates obtained from 2010 to 2012 from chickens with necrotic enteritis in Korea", POULTRY SCIENCE, Oxford, (20150403), vol. 94, no. 6, doi:10.3382/ps/pev037, ISSN 0032-5791, pages 1158 - 1164, XP055415904 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * Table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3382/ps/pev037 | by applicant | - ROOD, J. I., "Virulence genes of Clostridium perfringens", Annual Review of Microbiology, (19980000), vol. 52, pages 333 - 360 | - POPOFF, M. R.P. BOUVET, "Genetic characteristics of toxigenic Clostridia and toxin gene evolution", Toxicon, (20130000), vol. 75, doi:doi:10.1016/j.toxicon.2013.05.003, pages 63 - 89, XP028735687 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxicon.2013.05.003 | - WADE, B.KEYBURN, A.L., "The true cost of necrotic enteritis", World Poultry, (20150000), vol. 31, pages 16 - 17 | - KEYBURN, A. L. et al., "Alpha-toxin of Clostridium perfringens is not an essential virulence factor in necrotic enteritis in chickens", Infection and Immunity, (20060000), vol. 74, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1128/IAI.00806-06, pages 6496 - 6500, XP055007914 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.00806-06 | - TITBALL, R. W. et al., "The Clostridium perfringens a-toxin", Anaerobe, (19990000), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 51 - 64 | - KEYBURN, A. L. et al., "NetB, a new toxin that is associated with avian necrotic enteritis caused by Clostridium perfringens", PLoS Pathogens, (20080000), vol. 4, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1371/JOURNAL.PPAT.0040026, XP002536315 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/JOURNAL.PPAT.0040026 | - TIMBERMONT, L. et al., "Necrotic enteritis in broilers: An updated review on the pathogenesis", Avian Pathology, (20110000), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 341 - 347 | - SHOJADOOST, B.VINCE, A.R.PRESCOTT, J.F., "The successful experimental induction of necrotic enteritis in chickens by Clostridium perfringens: a critical review", Vet. Res., (20120000), vol. 43, doi:doi:10.1186/1297-9716-43-74, page 74, XP021134439 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1297-9716-43-74 | - FERNANDES DA COSTA, S.P.MOT, D.BOKORI-BROWN, M.SAVVA, C.G.BASAK, A.K.VAN IMMERSEEL, F.TITBALL, R.W., "Protection against avian necrotic enteritis after immunisation with NetB genetic or formaldehyde toxoids", Vaccine, (20130000), vol. 31, doi:doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2013.05.063, pages 4003 - 4008, XP028690341 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2013.05.063 | - WILLIAMS, R.B.MARSHALL, R.N.LA RAGIONE, R.M.CATCHPOLE, J., "A new method for the experimental production of necrotic enteritis and its use for studies on the relationships between necrotic enteritis, coccidiosis and anticoccidial vaccination of chickens", Parasitol. Res., (20030000), vol. 90, pages 19 - 26 | - WU, S.B.RODGERS, N.CHOCT, M., "Optimized necrotic enteritis model producing clinical and subclinical infection of Clostridium perfringens in broiler chickens", Avian Dis., (20100000), vol. 54, pages 1058 - 1065 | - WU S-BSTANLEY DRODGERS NSWICK RAMOORE RJ, "Two necrotic enteritis predisposing factors, dietary fishmeal and eimeria infection, induce large changes in the caecal microbiota of broiler chickens", Vet Microbiol, (20140000), vol. 169, page 188e97 |