EP3794145 - INFERRING SELECTION IN WHITE BLOOD CELL MATCHED CELL-FREE DNA VARIANTS AND/OR IN RNA VARIANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grail, Inc. 1525 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [2024/35] |
Former [2022/02] | For all designated states Grail, LLC 1525 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | ||
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Grail, Inc. 1525 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENN, Oliver Claude c/o GRAIL, INC. 1525 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 02 /
HUBBELL, Earl c/o GRAIL, INC. 1525 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/12] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19728842.6 | 20.05.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019US33168 | Priority number, date | US201862673779P | 18.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862673779 P | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019222757 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3794145 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6869, G16B30/00, G16B40/00 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6869 (EP);
G16B20/20 (US);
C12N15/1089 (US);
C12Q1/6874 (US);
G16B30/00 (EP);
G16B30/10 (US);
G16B40/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2537/165 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Title | German: | ABLEITUNG DER AUSWAHL IN WEISSEN BLUTZELLEN ANGEPASSTEN ZELLFREIEN DNA-VARIANTEN UND/ODER IN RNA-VARIANTEN | [2021/12] | English: | INFERRING SELECTION IN WHITE BLOOD CELL MATCHED CELL-FREE DNA VARIANTS AND/OR IN RNA VARIANTS | [2021/12] | French: | DÉDUCTION DE SÉLECTION DE VARIANTS D'ADN LIBRES CIRCULANTS CORRESPONDANT À DES GLOBULES BLANCS ET/OU DE VARIANTS D'ARN | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 14.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - Elaine R Mardis Et Al., "Recurring Mutations Found by Sequencing an Acute Myeloid Leukemia Genome", The New England Journal of Medicine, United States, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa0903840, (20090910), pages 1058 - 1066, URL: http://www.nejm.org/doi/pdf/10.1056/NEJMoa0903840, (20161124), XP055322685 [A] 1-115,168,261,262 * page 1058 "Results" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa0903840 | [A] - E PAPAEMMANUIL ET AL, "Somatic SF3B1 Mutation in Myelodysplasia with Ring Sideroblasts", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20110926), vol. 365, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1103283), pages 1384 - 1395, XP055053063 [A] 1-115,168,261,262 * title; page 1384 "Methods" and "Results" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1103283) | [XY] - MARTINCORENA IÑIGO ET AL, "Universal Patterns of Selection in Cancer and Somatic Tissues", CELL, (20171116), vol. 171, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2017.09.042, ISSN 0092-8674, page 1029, XP085251281 [X] 168,261,262 * the whole document * [Y] 1-115 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2017.09.042 | [XY] - Iñigo Martincorena ET AL, "Supplemental Information Universal Patterns of Selection in Cancer and Somatic Tissues", Cell, (20171116), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://www.cell.com/cms/10.1016/j.cell.2017.09.042/attachment/7cc08032-7493-4f38-99cb-f4a4c3fab608/mmc1.pdf, (20190802), XP055610586 [X] 168,261,262 * Table S1 * [Y] 1-115 | [Y] - FEDYANIN MIKHAIL ET AL, "Circulating tumor cells and circulating tumor DNA in colon cancer", MAGAZINE OF EUROPEAN MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, SPRINGER, AT, vol. 9, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S12254-016-0263-7, ISSN 1865-5041, (20160510), pages 88 - 92, (20160510), XP035991876 [Y] 1-115 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12254-016-0263-7 | [Y] - SARAH-JANE DAWSON ET AL, "Analysis of Circulating Tumor DNA to Monitor Metastatic Breast Cancer", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, - NEJM -, US, (20130328), vol. 368, no. 13, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1213261, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 1199 - 1209, XP055494258 [Y] 1-115 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1213261 | [Y] - HEITZER ELLEN, "Clinical utility of circulating tumor DNA in human cancers", MAGAZINE OF EUROPEAN MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, SPRINGER, AT, vol. 8, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S12254-015-0217-5, ISSN 1865-5041, (20150702), pages 222 - 226, (20150702), XP035957906 [Y] 1-115 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12254-015-0217-5 | [Y] - MINGCHAO XIE ET AL, "Age-related mutations associated with clonal hematopoietic expansion and malignancies", NATURE MEDICINE, New York, (20141019), vol. 20, no. 12, doi:10.1038/nm.3733, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 1472 - 1478, XP055246879 [Y] 2-115 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.3733 |