EP3818294 - CONTINUOUS PROVISION OF A VALID LUBRICANT SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Löwentaler Strasse 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VATH, Andreas Fuhrweg 16 63849 Leidersbach / DE | 02 /
BERGER, Günter Strassburger Allee 1a 44577 Castrop-Rauxel / DE | 03 /
TENCKHOFF, Georg Fichtenburgstrasse 22 88048 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | ZF Friedrichshafen AG Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz Löwentalerstraße 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 19728932.5 | 03.06.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019EP64283 | Priority number, date | DE201810211164 | 06.07.2018 Original published format: DE102018211164 | DE201810220584 | 29.11.2018 Original published format: DE102018220584 | [2021/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020007545 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3818294 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3818294 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16N29/00, G01N33/28, G01N1/20 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
F16N29/00 (EP);
F16N29/02 (US);
F16N39/06 (US);
F16N7/38 (US);
G01N1/2035 (EP,US);
G01N33/2888 (EP,US);
F16N2200/00 (EP);
F16N2200/10 (US);
F16N2250/08 (US);
F16N2250/50 (EP,US);
F16N2270/70 (US);
F16N2280/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | BEREITHALTUNG EINER VALIDEN SCHMIERSTOFFPROBE | [2021/19] | English: | CONTINUOUS PROVISION OF A VALID LUBRICANT SAMPLE | [2021/19] | French: | MISE À DISPOSITION D'UN ÉCHANTILLON DE LUBRIFIANT VALIDE | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 08.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 25.10.2023 | |
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 25.10.2023 | |
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 25.10.2023 | |
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE374396 (FRANKFURTER MASCHB AG) [X] 1,6-8 * page 2, line 46 - line 62; figure 1 *; | [XI]GB1501903 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO) [X] 1-3,7 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 61; figure 1 * [I] 10; | [X]US4649711 (SIBLEY HOWARD W [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract ** column 3, line 28 - line 42; figure 2 *; | [X]WO0032980 (HYDROX PIPELINE LTD [FI], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 28; figure 1 *; | [XI]DE102010004917 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10,11 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 22; figure 1 * [I] 4,8,9; | [XA]WO2018085875 (KOMATSU AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 7 - paragraph 8 * * page 5, paragraph 22; figures 1-3 * [A] 10,11 | by applicant | WO2017062273 |