EP3802422 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING MOLTEN SILICON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Polytechnique de Grenoble 46 avenue Félix Viallet 38000 Grenoble / FR | For all designated states Centre national de la recherche scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHICHIGNOUD, Guy 20 chemin Vieux dit Perrin 38100 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
ALTENBEREND, Jochen Friedhofweg 11 77746 Schutterwald / DE | 03 /
BAJOLET, Daniel 7 rue Saint Joseph Grenoble 38000 / FR | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Hautier IP 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Bronchart, Quentin Cabinet Hautier 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | Application number, filing date | 19728960.6 | 05.06.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019EP64591 | Priority number, date | FR20180000572 | 05.06.2018 Original published format: FR 1800572 | [2021/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019234072 | Date: | 12.12.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3802422 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/02, C01B33/021, C01B33/037, F27B14/10, F27D3/15, H01L31/18 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
F27B14/10 (EP);
C01B33/021 (EP);
F27B3/12 (EP);
F27D3/14 (EP);
F27D3/1509 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GESCHMOLZENEM SILIZIUM | [2021/15] | English: | DEVICE FOR PRODUCING MOLTEN SILICON | [2021/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE SILICIUM FONDU | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 27.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005034561 (LIEBAERT PHILIPPE [FR]); | [Y]US2009139445 (EINHAUS ROLAND [FR], et al); | [Y]CN102009180 (DALIAN LONGTIAN TECH CO LTD); | [XY]FR2981740 (EFD INDUCTION SA [FR]) |