EP3807362 - THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED UV RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2021 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INEOS Styrolution Group GmbH Mainzer Landstrasse 50 60325 Frankfurt / DE | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZ, Tobias Göttinger Str. 8 51103 Köln / DE | 02 /
RUTHARD, Christian Mainzer Str. 97 55124 Mainz / DE | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19729289.9 | 11.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019EP65109 | Priority number, date | EP20180178200 | 18.06.2018 Original published format: EP 18178200 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019243105 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3807362 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08L25/12, C08L51/04, C08L83/04, C08L25/16 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
C08L25/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,KR);
C08J3/005 (US);
C08F220/1804 (US);
C08J3/20 (US);
C08K3/013 (US);
C08K5/0041 (US);
C08L51/003 (US);
C08L83/04 (KR,US);
C08L83/10 (US);
C08L2201/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2201/52 (US);
C08L2203/30 (US);
C08L2205/02 (EP);
C08L2205/025 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP);
C08L2205/035 (EP,US);
C08L2205/18 (US);
C08L2205/22 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/12, C08L25/16, C08L51/04, C08L51/04, C08L83/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERBESSERTER UV-BESTÄNDIGKEIT | [2021/16] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED UV RESISTANCE | [2021/16] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE THERMOPLASTIQUE PRÉSENTANT UNE RÉSISTANCE AUX UV AMÉLIORÉE | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 12.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]KR101750603B (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15 * page 10; table 1 *; | [X]CN108164857 (LAIZHOU JIELI IND AND TRADE CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * example - *; | [XP]WO2019020677 (INEOS STYROLUTION GROUP GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-15 * example - *; | [XP]WO2019020680 (INEOS STYROLUTION GROUP GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-15* example - * | by applicant | DE1495626 | DE2232877 | DE2703376 | DE2714544 | DE2826925 | DE2842005 | DE3000610 | DE2940024 | DE3007934 | DE3149358 | DE3414118 | US4692486 | DE3832396 | EP0369203 | EP0369204 | EP0653447 | EP1153950 | DE10316198 | EP1529810 | EP1983018 | EP2436736 | WO2015078751 | WO2015132190 | WO2015150223 | EP2593510 | US9701813 | EP3219755 | - LANGE, Kolloid-Zeitschrift und Zeitschrift fur Polymere, (19680000), vol. 223, no. 1, pages 24 - 30 | - SCHOLTANLANGE, Kolloid-Zeitschrift und Zeitschrift fur Polymere, (19720000), vol. 250, no. 8, pages 782 - 796 | - W. WOHLLEBENH. SCHUCH, Measurement of Particle Size Distribution of Polymer Latexes, (20100000), pages 129 - 153 |