EP3809985 - COUPLING PORTION FOR ROTARY SURGICAL CUTTING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Xomed, Inc. 6743 Southpoint Drive North Jacksonville, FL 32216 / US | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Thoai 2314 Lake Shore Blvd. Jacksonville, Florida 32210 / US | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19729402.8 | 09.05.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019US31473 | Priority number, date | US201816013253 | 20.06.2018 Original published format: US201816013253 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019245664 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809985 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3809985 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A61B17/162 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/1622 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/1617 (US);
A61B17/1624 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/1631 (KR);
A61B17/1628 (US);
A61B2017/00477 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUPPLUNGSTEIL FÜR ROTIERENDE CHIRURGISCHE SCHNEIDSYSTEME | [2021/17] | English: | COUPLING PORTION FOR ROTARY SURGICAL CUTTING SYSTEMS | [2021/17] | French: | PARTIE DE COUPLAGE POUR SYSTÈMES DE COUPE CHIRURGICAUX ROTATIFS | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 15.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007002230 (STRYKER CORP [US], et al) [X] 1* figure 27A *; | [X]WO2009012457 (STRYKER IRELAND LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1-20 * figures 2, 5-7, 17 *; | [X]GB2491524 (SOUTTER MEDICAL LTD DE [GB]) [X] 1,16 * figures 14, 15 *; | [X]US2016278802 (CIHAK PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,16 * figures 4-15 * |