EP3810216 - BIOACTIVE SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Hochschule Nürnberg Georg Simon Ohm Keßlerplatz 12 90489 Nürnberg / DE | For all designated states Klinikum Nürnberg Medical School GmbH Prof.-Ernst-Nathan-Str. 1 90419 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENHART, Armin Eggenweiherstrasse 3 91077 Neunkirchen a. Brand / DE | 02 /
FORCHHEIMER, Lukas Regensburger Strasse 60 90478 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
SCHULZE-TANZIL, Gundula Cranachstrasse 42 12157 Berlin / DE | 04 /
GÖGELE, Clemens Hans-Webersdorfer-Strasse 30 5020 Salzburg / AT | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Dr. Kurt-Schumacher-Str. 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19729515.7 | 06.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019EP64758 | Priority number, date | DE201810114946 | 21.06.2018 Original published format: DE102018114946 | [2021/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019243066 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810216 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/58 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A61L27/56 (EP);
A61L27/10 (EP);
A61L27/3804 (EP);
A61L27/3817 (EP);
A61L27/3834 (EP);
A61L27/58 (EP);
C03B19/06 (EP);
C03C21/006 (EP);
C03C3/112 (EP);
C03C4/0007 (EP);
C03C8/16 (EP);
A61L2400/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | BIOAKTIVER TRÄGER | [2021/17] | English: | BIOACTIVE SUBSTRATE | [2021/17] | French: | SUPPORT BIOACTIF | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 10.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/02] | 23.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2014168631 (MOSCI CORP [US]) [AD] 1-25 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0009] , [0014] , [0026] , [0031] , [0032] , [0035] , [0038] *; | [AD]WO2011161422 (QUEEN MARY & WESTFIELD COLLEGE [GB], et al) [AD] 1-25 * page 1, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 2, paragraphs 5,6 * * page 4, paragraphs 1,3 * * page 6, paragraph 4 * * table 1a *; | [A] - KUBOKI Y ET AL, "Geometry of carriers controlling phenotypic expression in BMP-induced osteogenesis and chondrogenesis.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (2001), Database accession no. NLM11314788, XP002794001 [A] 1-25 * abstract * | [ ] - KUBOKI Y ET AL, "Geometry of carriers controlling phenotypic expression in BMP-induced osteogenesis and chondrogenesis.", THE JOURNAL OF BONE AND JOINT SURGERY. AMERICAN VOLUME 2001, (2001), vol. 83-A Suppl 1, no. Pt 2, ISSN 0021-9355, pages S105 - S115 | by applicant | WO2011161422 | WO2016089731 | WO2014168631 |