EP3807366 - FLAME RETARDANT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis AG Trabrennstrasse 6-8 1020 Vienna / AT | [2022/10] |
Former [2021/16] | For all designated states Borealis AG IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19 1220 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEFOER, Johan Tervuursesteenweg 160 2800 Mechelen / BE | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19729574.4 | 14.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019EP65763 | Priority number, date | EP20180178135 | 15.06.2018 Original published format: EP 18178135 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019238957 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3807366 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/18, C09D7/61, C09D7/48, C09D7/65, C08K3/016, C09D123/04, C08L23/04, C09K21/04, C09K21/14 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
C09D5/18 (EP,US);
A43B1/00 (US);
C08K3/32 (US);
C08L23/14 (EP);
C08L23/16 (EP);
C09D123/0815 (US);
C09D123/14 (EP);
C09D7/48 (EP);
C09D7/61 (EP);
C09D7/65 (EP);
C09K21/04 (EP,US);
C09K21/14 (US);
D06N3/0009 (US);
D06N3/0059 (US);
D06N3/045 (US);
C08K2003/323 (EP,US);
C08K3/016 (EP);
C08L2201/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/035 (EP,US);
D06N2209/067 (US);
D06N2211/103 (US);
D06N2211/106 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/14, C08L23/0815, C08L23/14, C08L23/0892, C08K3/32 (EP);
C08L23/16, C08L23/0815 (EP);
C08L23/16, C08L23/0815, C08L23/0815 (EP);
C08L23/16, C08L23/0815, C08L23/0815, C08L23/12, C08L23/16 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | FLAMMENHEMMENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2021/16] | English: | FLAME RETARDANT COMPOSITION | [2021/16] | French: | COMPOSITION IGNIFUGE | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 15.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2007246730 ; | [XY]KR20110138011 ; | [XY]KR101165565B ; | [Y]EP0365289 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [Y] 8 * page 4, lines 1-29, 47; example 1; claims 1,4-6 *; | [A]WO2011144575 (DOW CORNING [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0033] , [0 34] *; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 04, Database accession no. 2008-A53811, XP002785012 & JP2007246730 A 20070927 (MITSUI DU PONT POLYCHEMICAL KK) [X] 1-4,9-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] , [0 40] , [0 44] , [0 45]; example 6; table 1 * [Y] 8 | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 46, Database accession no. 2012-A30239, XP002785013 & KR20110138011 A 20111226 (HOWSOL CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] , [0 32]; claims 1-4 * [Y] 8 | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 53, Database accession no. 2012-J66981, XP002793945 & KR101165565B B1 20120716 (KP CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0055]; claims 1-3 * [Y] 8 | by applicant | FR5110E | US5504172 | WO0001745 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, (19860000), vol. 6, pages 383 - 410 | - "Polyethylene: High-pressure", R.KLIMESCHD.LITTMANNF.-O. MAHLING, Encyclopedia of Materials: Science and Technology, Elsevier Science Ltd., (20010000), pages 7181 - 7184 |