EP3806824 - FORMULATIONS/COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING IBRUTINIB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNINI, Maristella c/o Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | 02 /
DONG, Wenyu c/o Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | 03 /
HOLM, René c/o Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Purewal, Savroop Janssen Pharmaceutica NV J&J Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19729770.8 | 14.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019EP65637 | Priority number, date | EP20180177987 | 15.06.2018 Original published format: EP 18177987 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019238904 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3806824 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/10, A61K47/10, A61K47/38, A61K31/519, A61P35/00, A61P35/02 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
A61K9/10 (EP,KR);
A61K47/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/02 (US);
A61K47/12 (KR,US);
A61K47/26 (KR,US);
A61K47/38 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Extension states | BA | 15.01.2021 | ME | 15.01.2021 | Validation states | KH | 15.01.2021 | MA | 15.01.2021 | MD | 15.01.2021 | TN | 15.01.2021 | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN/ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT IBRUTINIB | [2021/16] | English: | FORMULATIONS/COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING IBRUTINIB | [2021/16] | French: | FORMULATIONS/COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DE L'IBRUTINIB | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 15.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.07.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2016019341 (PHARMACYCLICS LLC [US]); | [AD]WO2016164404 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]); | [X]WO2017205843 (TG THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US6326469 | WO2008039218 | US7514444 | WO2013184572 | WO2014004707 | US2014336203 | WO2016022942 | WO2016141068 | WO2016160604 | WO2016156127 | WO2016164404 | WO2017125423 | WO2017125424 |