EP3793963 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A CMC PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/12] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A CMC PART | ||
[2023/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFRAN 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states Safran Ceramics Les Cinq Chemins Rue de Touban 33185 Le Haillan / FR | For all designated states SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PODGORSKI, Michaël c/o Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI) Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | 02 /
DAMBRINE, Bruno, Jacques, Gérard c/o Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI) Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | 03 /
MENDEZ, Emilie, Chantal, Gisèle c/o Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI) Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | 04 /
ZHANG, Wen c/o Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI) Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | 05 /
RAPPART, Yvan c/o Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI) Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | 06 /
LELEU, Charles cc/o Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI) Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 19730199.7 | 15.05.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019FR51102 | Priority number, date | FR20180054047 | 15.05.2018 Original published format: FR 1854047 | FR20180054053 | 15.05.2018 Original published format: FR 1854053 | [2021/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019220057 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3793963 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3793963 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/80, C04B41/89, F01D5/28, C04B41/45, C04B41/50, C04B35/628, C04B35/573, C04B41/88, B22C9/04, C04B35/565, B22C7/02 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
B22C7/02 (EP);
B22C9/04 (EP);
C04B35/185 (US);
C04B35/573 (EP,US);
C04B35/583 (US);
C04B35/584 (US);
C04B35/62868 (EP);
C04B35/62873 (EP);
C04B35/62897 (EP);
C04B35/78 (US);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/459 (US);
C04B41/47 (US);
C04B41/5096 (US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/89 (EP);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
C04B2235/422 (EP,US);
C04B2235/428 (EP);
C04B2235/5244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5248 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5252 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP);
C04B2235/5445 (EP);
C04B2235/6028 (EP,US);
C04B2235/614 (EP);
C04B2235/616 (EP);
F05D2260/95 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/565, C04B35/806 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/50 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/5096 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | C04B35/80, C04B35/565, B22C9/04, C04B41/88, C04B35/573, C04B35/628, C04B41/50, C04B41/45, F01D5/28, C04B41/89 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES CMC-TEILS | [2021/12] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A CMC PART | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PIÈCE CMC | [2021/12] |
Former [2021/12] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A CMC PART | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 03.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US5394930 (KENNERKNECHT STEVEN [CA]) [Y] 6-13 * claims 1, 2, 4, 7 * * figures 1A-1H * * column 4, lines 9, 32-39 * * column 6, lines 5-6 * * column 7, lines 48-55 * [A] 1-5; | [YA]FR2779425 (FROT DIDIER [FR]) [Y] 1,3-5 * claims 3, 11 * * page 1, lines 2-5, 23-25 * [A] 2,6-13; | [A]US2012171039 (HUANG SHYH-CHIN [US], et al) [A] 6-13 * claims 8, 17-18 * * figure 6 * * paragraph [0032] *; | [A]WO2014053751 (HERAKLES [FR]) [A] 1-5* claims 1, 4, 5, 9, 10 *; | [YA]WO2016001026 (HERAKLES [FR]) [Y] 1,3-5 * claims 8, 9 * * figure 3 * * page 1, lines 17-18, 32-36 * * page 2, lines 13-15 * * page 4, lines 7-9 * * page 17, lines 22-23 * * page 19, lines 23-24 * [A] 2; | [Y]US2016102022 (CHAMBERLAIN ADAM L [US], et al) [Y] 6-13 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0021] - [0022] - [0 29] , [0 31] - [0037] * | by applicant | WO2006136755 |