EP3810139 - TRICYCLIC PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITORS FOR PROMOTING LIVER REGENERATION OR REDUCING OR PREVENTING HEPATOCYTE DEATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HepaRegeniX GmbH Eisenbahnstr. 63 72072 Tübingen / DE | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUCHUM, Michael Heinrich-von-Brentano-Straße 14 64625 Bensheim / DE | 02 /
SELIG, Roland Allacher Str. 311 80999 München / DE | 03 /
LAUFER, Stefan Otto-Erbe-Weg 86 72070 Tübingen / DE | 04 /
ALBRECHT, Wolfgang Alfred-Mendler-Weg 25/1 89075 Ulm / DE | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19730377.9 | 18.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019EP65995 | Priority number, date | EP20180179035 | 21.06.2018 Original published format: EP 18179035 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019243315 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810139 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4745, A61P31/20 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/4745 (EP);
C07D471/04 (US);
A61P31/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | TRICYCLISCHE PROTEINKINASEINHIBITOREN ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER LEBERREGENERATION ODER ZUR VERMINDERUNG ODER VERHINDERUNG DES HEPATOZYTENTODES | [2021/17] | English: | TRICYCLIC PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITORS FOR PROMOTING LIVER REGENERATION OR REDUCING OR PREVENTING HEPATOCYTE DEATH | [2021/17] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE PROTÉINE KINASE TRICYCLIQUES POUR FAVORISER LA RÉGÉNÉRATION DU FOIE OU RÉDUIRE OU PRÉVENIR LA MORT DES HÉPATOCYTES | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 16.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2020 | Observations by third parties | 03.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6514981 (TANG PENG CHO [US], et al); | [A]FR2876377 (UNIV CLAUDE BERNARD LYON [FR], et al); | [A]EP2161271 (UNIV MILANO BICOCCA [IT], et al); | by applicant | WO2007002433 | WO2007002325 | WO2010002325 | WO2010111527 | WO2011079133 | WO2012109075 | WO2012136859 | WO2014194127 | WO2016000827 | WO2016112305 |