EP3791162 - MULTI-POINT DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINN, Alan Matthew 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, Florida 33418 / US | 02 /
BIRNKRANT, Michael J. 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, Florida 33418 / US | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19730602.0 | 08.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019US31234 | Priority number, date | US201862670143P | 11.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862670143 P | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019217504 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791162 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/53, G08B17/103, G01S17/89, G01S7/481 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
G01N21/53 (EP,US);
G08B17/107 (EP,US);
G08B29/188 (EP);
G01N2021/1793 (EP);
G01N2021/3513 (EP);
G01N2021/4792 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | MEHRPUNKTDETEKTIONSSYSTEM | [2021/11] | English: | MULTI-POINT DETECTION SYSTEM | [2021/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION MULTIPOINT | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 29.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008297360 (KNOX RON [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,7-12,20,22 * paragraphs [0144] , [0161] , [0196] , [0208] , [0228] , [0229] , [0235] * * figure 9 *[I] 23-26; | [XI]US2012038903 (WEIMER CARL S [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-13,20,21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0031] , [0034] , [0037] , [0051] , [0056] * * figures 3A-F * [I] 5,6,14-19 |