EP3806909 - ENGINEERING EXTRACELLULAR VESICLES FOR AFFINITY PURIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evox Therapeutics Ltd Oxford Science Park Medawar Centre 2nd Floor East Building Robert Robinson Avenue Oxford OX4 4HG / GB | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LLORENTE, Virginia Castilla Evox Therapeutics Limited Oxford Science Park, Medawar Centre 2nd Floor East Building, Robert Robinson Avenue Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 4HG / GB | 02 /
LUNDIN, Per 4 William Street Marston Oxford Oxfordshire OX3 0ER / GB | 03 /
HEAN, Justin 17 Aldrich Road Oxford Oxfordshire OX2 7SS / GB | 04 /
AMIN, Harsh 1 Leas Lane Marcham Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6FT / GB | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19730734.1 | 11.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019EP65116 | Priority number, date | GB20180009622 | 12.06.2018 Original published format: GB 201809622 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019238626 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3806909 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C07K14/705, C12N15/88, A61K47/64 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C12N15/88 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/20 (EP);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/531, C12N2310/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | MANIPULATION VON EXTRAZELLULÄREN VESIKELN ZUR AFFINITÄTSREINIGUNG | [2021/16] | English: | ENGINEERING EXTRACELLULAR VESICLES FOR AFFINITY PURIFICATION | [2021/16] | French: | INGÉNIERIE DE VÉSICULES EXTRACELLULAIRES POUR UNE PURIFICATION PAR AFFINITÉ | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 11.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2015002956 (OHIO STATE INNOVATION FOUNDATION [US]) [X] 1-5,8,10,12-16,18-20,22,23,35,36 * abstract * * page 3, line 16 - line 25 * * page 8, line 17 - page 9, line 13 * * page 11, line 1 - line 16 * * page 12, line 11 - line 24 * [I] 6,7,9,11,17,21,24-34; | [XI]US2015093433 (LEONARD JOSHUA N [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10,12-16,18-20,22,23,35,36 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 25 * * page 3, paragraph 29 * * page 4, paragraphs 36,39 * * page 8, paragraph 68 * [I] 6,7,11,17,21,24-34; | [Y]US2018015182 (LU BIAO [US], et al) [Y] 1-36 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 5,7 * * page 4, paragraphs 35,39 * * page 5, paragraphs 41-46 *; | [Y]WO2018011191 (EVOX THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-36 * abstract ** page 32 - page 33; claims 1,2,7 *; | [Y] - LYDIA ALVAREZ-ERVITI ET AL, "Delivery of siRNA to the mouse brain by systemic injection of targeted exosomes", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, New York, (20110320), vol. 29, no. 4, doi:10.1038/nbt.1807, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 341 - 345, XP055554900 [Y] 1-36 * abstract * * page 341, column r, paragraphs 2,4 * * page 342; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1807 | by applicant | WO0044389 | WO2014168548 |