EP3775395 - A GROUND SURFACE ACCESS ASSEMBLY REINFORCED COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wrekin Holdings Limited Europa Way Britannia Enterprise Park Lichfield, Staffordshire WS14 9TZ / GB | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURNER, Barry c/o Wrekin Holdings Limited Europa Way Britannia Enterprise Park Lichfield Staffordshire WS14 9TZ / GB | 02 /
EVANS, Samantha Sarah Elizabeth c/o Wrekin Holdings Limited Europa Way Britannia Enterprise Park Lichfield Staffordshire WS14 9TZ / GB | 03 /
RATCLIFFE, Liam Mark c/o Wrekin Holdings Limited Europa Way Britannia Enterprise Park Lichfield Staffordshire WS19 9TZ / GB | 04 /
GIBSON, Simon John c/o Wrekin Holdings Limited Europa Way Britannia Enterprise Park Lichfield Staffordshire WS14 9TZ / GB | 05 /
TURNER, Stanley c/o Wrekin Holdings Limited Europa Way Britannia Enterprise Park Lichfield Staffordshire WS14 9TZ / GB | 06 /
NEILSON, Paul Drummond c/o Wrekin Holdings Limited Europa Way Britannia Enterprise Park Lichfield Stafforshire WS14 9TZ / GB | 07 /
TURNER, Simon John c/o Wrekin Holdings Limited Europa Way Britannia Enterprise Park Lichfield Staffordshire WS14 9TZ / GB | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Tart, Keith Raymond Four Oaks Patents Ltd. 162 Walsall Road Four Oaks Sutton Coldfield, W Mids B74 4RD / GB | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19730877.8 | 20.05.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019GB51392 | Priority number, date | GB20180005326 | 30.03.2018 Original published format: GB 201805326 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019186211 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3775395 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3775395 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/14 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
E02D29/14 (EP,GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKTE ABDECKUNG FÜR BODENOBERFLÄCHENZUGANGSANORDNUNG | [2021/07] | English: | A GROUND SURFACE ACCESS ASSEMBLY REINFORCED COVER | [2021/07] | French: | COUVERCLE RENFORCÉ D'ENSEMBLE D'ACCÈS À LA SURFACE DU SOL | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2019 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 22.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2021 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 18.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2021/07] | 16.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 03.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 16.12.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.12.2023 | ES | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 13.12.2023 | |
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]EP1826321 (SAINT GOBAIN PONT A MOUSSON [FR]) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0014]; figures 1,2 * [A] 3,4,7-9[I] 6 | Examination | GB2432868 | EP1826321 | by applicant | GB236807 | GB2299603 |