EP3818789 - TAILORED CONDUCTIVE INTERCONNECT STRUCTURES HAVING MICROSTRUCTURES SUPPORTED BY A SHRINKABLE POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02451-1449 / US | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSSE, Kyle L. 870 Winter Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 02 /
TRENT, Catherine 870 Winter Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 19730998.2 | 06.05.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019US30949 | Priority number, date | US201816029507 | 06.07.2018 Original published format: US201816029507 | [2021/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020009744 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3818789 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/02, H05K1/03, H05K3/00 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
H05K1/0313 (EP,IL,US);
H05K1/028 (IL,US);
G03F7/0002 (IL,US);
H05K1/0283 (EP,IL);
H05K1/0284 (EP,IL);
H05K1/0393 (EP,IL);
H05K1/09 (US);
H05K3/0058 (EP,IL);
H05K3/22 (IL,US);
H05K2201/0125 (EP,IL);
H05K2201/0129 (EP,IL);
H05K2201/026 (EP,IL);
H05K2201/0281 (EP,IL);
H05K2201/09009 (US);
H05K2201/09245 (US);
H05K2203/1105 (EP,IL)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | MASSGESCHNEIDERTE LEITFÄHIGE VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUREN MIT MIKROSTRUKTUREN, DIE VON EINEM SCHRUMPFBAREN POLYMER GETRAGEN WERDEN | [2021/19] | English: | TAILORED CONDUCTIVE INTERCONNECT STRUCTURES HAVING MICROSTRUCTURES SUPPORTED BY A SHRINKABLE POLYMER | [2021/19] | French: | STRUCTURES D'INTERCONNEXION CONDUCTRICES ADAPTÉES COMPRENANT DES MICROSTRUCTURES SUPPORTÉES PAR UN POLYMÈRE RÉTRACTABLE | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 25.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4725478 (MATHIAS ECKART [US], et al) [Y] 3,12 * column 1, lines 60-61 ** column 2, lines 15-18 *; | [A]JPH0472698 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-32 * figure 2 * * abstract *; | [XYI]US2015284855 (IWASHITA TAISUKE [JP]) [X] 1,10,17,18,20-23,26-28 * claims 1-3 * * figures 5,7,8 * * paragraphs [0069] - [0071] - [0073] , [0089] , [0104] , [0129] * [Y] 2,3,11,12,24,31 [I] 4-9,12-16,19,25,29,30,32; | [Y]US2016192501 (YAN CHAOYI [SG], et al) [Y] 2,11,24,31 * paragraphs [0235] , [0236] * |