EP3977308 - LEARNING-BASED QUERY PLAN CACHE FOR CAPTURING LOW-COST QUERY PLAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Ron-Chung 37 Erstwild Court Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 02 /
GHAZAL, Ahmad 1914 Harriman Lane, Unit B Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Mingyi 1092 Sunlite Drive Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 19731043.6 | 24.05.2019 | [2022/14] | WO2019US33929 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020242439 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977308 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3977308 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F18/21 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
G06F16/24542 (EP,US);
G06F16/24524 (EP);
G06F18/217 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | G06F16/2453, G06F16/2452 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LERNBASIERTER ABFRAGEPLAN-ZWISCHENSPEICHER ZUR ERFASSUNG EINES KOSTENGÜNSTIGEN ABFRAGEPLANS | [2022/14] | English: | LEARNING-BASED QUERY PLAN CACHE FOR CAPTURING LOW-COST QUERY PLAN | [2022/14] | French: | CACHE DE PLAN DE REQUÊTE BASÉ SUR L'APPRENTISSAGE POUR CAPTURER UN PLAN DE REQUÊTE À FAIBLE COÛT | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 07.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23211055.1 / EP4303743 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | IT | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2002198867 (LOHMAN GUY MARING [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0028] , [0032] , [0033] , [0034] , [0037] , [0048] , [0058] , [0059] , [0080] *; | [A]US2009106219 (BELKNAP PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0024] , [0027] , [0058] , [0060] , [0064] , [0074] , [0077] , [0080] , [0083] , [0092] , [0103] , [0109] , [0125] - [0127] * |