EP3793654 - DEVICE FOR DISPENSING A FLUID PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptar France SAS Lieudit le Prieuré 27110 Le Neubourg / FR | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAM, Fabien 15 lotissement des Houx Verts 27930 Aviron / FR | 02 /
LEBEL, Baptiste 1 rue du compas 27100 Val De Reuil / FR | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | CAPRI 33 rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | [2022/16] |
Former [2021/12] | CAPRI 33, rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 19731323.2 | 16.05.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019FR51119 | Priority number, date | FR20180054172 | 18.05.2018 Original published format: FR 1854172 | [2021/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019220062 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3793654 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3793654 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/08, B05B11/00, A61M11/00, A61M15/00 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
A61M11/007 (EP,US);
A61M15/0021 (EP);
A61M15/08 (EP);
B05B11/02 (EP);
A61M15/0036 (EP);
A61M15/004 (EP);
A61M2202/0468 (EP);
A61M2210/0618 (EP);
A61M2210/0625 (EP);
A61M2210/0643 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | A61M11/00, A61M11/08, A61M15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSGABE EINES FLUIDPRODUKTS | [2021/12] | English: | DEVICE FOR DISPENSING A FLUID PRODUCT | [2021/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUIT FLUIDE | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 14.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2019 | AL | 20.04.2022 | AT | 20.04.2022 | CY | 20.04.2022 | CZ | 20.04.2022 | DK | 20.04.2022 | EE | 20.04.2022 | ES | 20.04.2022 | FI | 20.04.2022 | HR | 20.04.2022 | LT | 20.04.2022 | LV | 20.04.2022 | MC | 20.04.2022 | MK | 20.04.2022 | NL | 20.04.2022 | PL | 20.04.2022 | RO | 20.04.2022 | RS | 20.04.2022 | SE | 20.04.2022 | SI | 20.04.2022 | SK | 20.04.2022 | SM | 20.04.2022 | TR | 20.04.2022 | IE | 16.05.2022 | LU | 16.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.07.2022 | GR | 21.07.2022 | IS | 20.08.2022 | PT | 22.08.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 16.05.2019 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
MK | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
MK | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 20.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2003041859 (ABRAMS ANDREW L [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0023] - [0032]; figures 1-3 *; | [I]US2005268915 (WASSENAAR WILLEM [CA], et al) [I] 1-13* paragraph [0061]; figures 1-4 *; | [XAI]WO2013023258 (DE CARVALHO PAULO ROBERTO [BR], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8 * figures 3,4 * [A] 7,9,12,13 [I] 2,6,10,11 | by applicant | US2003041859 | US2005268915 | WO2013023258 | WO2014147329 |