24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
25.08.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
18.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
26.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
05.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
24.03.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
21.10.2022 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
16.09.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
09.09.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.09.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.09.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.04.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.12.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.08.2021 |
First examination report |
|
12.08.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.08.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
06.08.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
14.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.11.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
06.11.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
06.11.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
23.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.08.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
31.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
26.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|