EP3942535 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BAGGAGE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flughafen Wien Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1 1300 Wien / AT | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPITZER, Franz Schlag 30 3874 Litschau / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
SPITZER, Franz 3874 Litschau / AT | Representative(s) | Puchberger & Partner Patentanwälte Reichsratsstraße 13 1010 Wien / AT | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 19731642.5 | 11.06.2019 | [2022/04] | WO2019EP65199 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020249192 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3942535 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, G07C9/37, G07C9/25, B64F1/36 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
G07C9/00563 (EP,US);
G07C9/257 (EP,US);
B64F1/368 (EP,US);
G07C9/00896 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONTROLLE VON GEPÄCK | [2022/04] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BAGGAGE CONTROL | [2022/04] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DE BAGAGES | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 20.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2022 | Observations by third parties | 20.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007029165 (BENDER TONYA K [US], et al) [A] 12* paragraph [0033]; figure 2 *; | [YA]US7193515 (ROBERTS JON L [US], et al) [Y] 7 * column 8, line 16 - column 11, line 11; figures 3,5 * [A] 1,4,16; | [Y]DE102009022716 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 15,22 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US2012228377 (CARPENTER MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-12,14,16-19,21 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0 34] , [0 35] , [0 37] , [0 41] , [0 50]; figures 1-15 * [Y] 7,15,22; | [X]EP3147840 (NUCTECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-3,5,7,16 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-7 * | other | US2012228377 |