02.07.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.07.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.12.2021 |
First examination report |
|
02.12.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.08.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
27.08.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
02.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.02.2021 |
Change - applicant |
|
12.02.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
09.02.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
06.11.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
06.11.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
06.11.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
06.10.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
30.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.09.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
08.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.12.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
09.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|