Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019243426 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18184284 | 18.07.2018 | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 | US201862687876 | 21.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024042410 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318462228 | 06.09.2023 | EP18184284 | 18.07.2018 | WO2019EP66215 | 19.06.2019 | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 | US202016975042 | 21.08.2020 | US201862687876 | 21.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021106966 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916975042 | 19.06.2019 | EP18184284 | 18.07.2018 | WO2019EP66215 | 19.06.2019 | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 | US201862687876 | 21.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021106964 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP66213 | 19.06.2019 | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7504798B | Global Dossier | 24.06.2024 | B2 | JP2021528223 | 21.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18184284 | 18.07.2018 | WO2019EP66215 | 19.06.2019 | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 | US201862687876 | 21.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7504800B | Global Dossier | 24.06.2024 | B2 | JP2021527554 | 14.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP66213 | 19.06.2019 | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3746217 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18184284 | 18.07.2018 | WO2019EP66215 | 19.06.2019 | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 | US201862687876 | 21.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111918714B | Global Dossier | 11.08.2023 | B | CN111918714 | 10.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP66213 | 19.06.2019 | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111801155B | Global Dossier | 02.05.2023 | B | CN111801155 | 20.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18184284 | 18.07.2018 | WO2019EP66215 | 19.06.2019 | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 | US201862687876 | 21.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3746216 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP66213 | 19.06.2019 | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020008823 | 28.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18184284 | 18.07.2018 | WO2019EP66215 | 19.06.2019 | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 | US201862687876 | 21.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020009712 | 07.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP66213 | 19.06.2019 | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11202008071Y | 29.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18184284 | 18.07.2018 | WO2019EP66215 | 19.06.2019 | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 | US201862687876 | 21.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11202008552W | 29.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP66213 | 19.06.2019 | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019243425 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18179125 | 21.06.2018 |