EP3746216 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING MICROCAPSULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | [2021/11] |
Former [2020/50] | For all designated states Firmenich SA P.O. Box 239, 1, route des Jeunes 1211 Geneva 8 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELABBADI, Amal Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | 02 /
ERNI, Philipp Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | 03 /
JACQUEMOND, Marlene Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Strych, Sebastian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | Dureisseix, Valérie Firmenich SA Corporate Legal & Compliance - IP Group 7, rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | Application number, filing date | 19732019.5 | 19.06.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019EP66213 | Priority number, date | EP20180179125 | 21.06.2018 Original published format: EP 18179125 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019243425 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3746216 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/10, A61Q3/00, A61Q5/02, A61Q19/00, A61K8/11, A61K9/50, B01J13/14, B01J13/16, C11D3/50, A23L27/12 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
B01J13/10 (EP,US);
A23L27/72 (EP,US);
A23P10/30 (EP,US);
B01J13/14 (EP);
B01J13/16 (EP,US);
C11D3/505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MIKROKAPSELN | [2020/50] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING MICROCAPSULES | [2020/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE MICROCAPSULES | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 03.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2008085997 (OCEAN NUTRITION CANADA LTD [CA], et al); | [XI]WO2009054841 (SENSIENT FLAVORS INC [US], et al); | [XI]US2010055281 (BARROW COLIN J [AU], et al); | [A]US2017216166 (SASAKI TAKASHI [US], et al) |