EP3612930 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENT TYPES OF BLOCKCHAIN CONTRACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced New Technologies Co., Ltd. Cayman Corporate Centre 27 Hospital Road George Town, Grand Cayman KY1-9008 / KY | [2021/02] |
Former [2020/09] | For all designated states ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LIMITED Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town, Grand Cayman / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, He Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F, Building 3 No. 969 West Wen Yi Road, Yu Hang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Branderhorst, Matthijs Pieter Arie Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 19732214.2 | 26.03.2019 | [2020/09] | WO2019CN79712 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019120316 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3612930 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/30, G06F9/455, G06F21/64, H04L9/32, H04L9/00 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
H04L9/50 (EP,CN);
G06F9/45508 (CN,US);
G06F21/64 (EP,CN);
G06F8/31 (CN);
G06F8/315 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/455 (EP);
G06F9/45558 (CN);
H04L9/0637 (US);
H04L9/3236 (CN);
H04L9/3239 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (CN);
G06F2009/45575 (CN);
G06F2009/45595 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | G06F9/451, G06F8/30, G06F8/00, G06F9/455, G06F21/64, H04L9/32 | ||
Former IPC [2020/09] | G06F9/451 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG VERSCHIEDENER TYPEN VON BLOCKCHAIN-VERTRÄGEN | [2020/09] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENT TYPES OF BLOCKCHAIN CONTRACTS | [2020/09] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR IMPLÉMENTER DIFFÉRENTS TYPES DE CONTRATS À CHAÎNE DE BLOCS | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.10.2023 | 27.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN107833060 (BANK OF CHINA CO LTD); | [A]US2019066101 (MITCHELL JOHN [US], et al); | [A]WO2019042101 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | International search | [A]US2018018723 (NAGLA GAURAV [CA], et al); | [X]CN107833060 (BANK OF CHINA CO LTD); | [A]CN109493042 (UNIV NANJING POSTS & TELECOMMUNICATIONS); | [E]CN110249307 (ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LTD) | by applicant | CN107833060 | US2019066101 | WO2019042101 |