Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3807243 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3807243



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(40)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 163
31.03.2025 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
05.06.2024 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
25.04.2024 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.04.2024 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.04.2024 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
11.04.2024 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
11.04.2024 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
13.12.2023 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.12.2023 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
13.12.2023 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
13.12.2023 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
13.12.2023 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 14
13.12.2023 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 14
17.11.2023 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.11.2021 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
22.09.2021 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
24.03.2021 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.02.2021 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
29.01.2021 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.01.2021 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.01.2021 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.01.2021 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.01.2021 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2021 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
14.01.2021 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
14.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.01.2021 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
14.01.2021 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
11.01.2021 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
23.10.2020 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
10.01.2020 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
19.12.2019 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
19.12.2019 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 15
27.06.2019 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
26.06.2019 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
25.06.2019 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 10
10.06.2019 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
10.06.2019 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
10.06.2019 Description PCT receiving Office 12
10.06.2019 Request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 9