EP3810630 - PEPTIDE LIGANDS FOR BINDING TO IL-17 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BicycleTX Limited B900, Babraham Research Campus Cambridge, CB22 3AT / GB | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEUFEL, Daniel Meditrina Building c/o Bicycle Therapeutics Limited Babraham Research Campus Cambridge, CB22 3AT / GB | 02 /
MUDD, Gemma Meditrina Building c/o Bicycle Therapeutics Limited Babraham Research Campus Cambridge, CB22 3AT / GB | 03 /
PAVAN, Silvia Meditrina Building c/o Bicycle Therapeutics Limited Babraham Research Campus Cambridge, CB22 3AT / GB | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19732593.9 | 18.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019EP66060 | Priority number, date | GB20180010327 | 22.06.2018 Original published format: GB 201810327 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019243350 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810630 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/08, A61K47/64 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
C07K7/08 (EP,US);
A61K47/64 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | PEPTIDLIGANDEN ZUR BINDUNG AN IL-17 | [2021/17] | English: | PEPTIDE LIGANDS FOR BINDING TO IL-17 | [2021/17] | French: | LIGANDS PEPTIDIQUES SE LIANT À IL-17 | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 14.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/36] | 02.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2009098450 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [Y] 1-19 * page 20 - page 21; figures 15A, 15B *; | [Y]WO2016067035 (BICYCLE THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-19 * page 10 - page 14; claims 1-41 *; | [XDP]WO2018115203 (BICYCLERD LTD [GB]) [XDP] 1-5,13-19* figures 3-6,10-13; claims 1-23 *; | [Y] - KALE SANGRAM S ET AL, "Cyclization of peptides with two chemical bridges affords large scaffold diversities", NATURE CHEMISTRY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP UK, LONDON, vol. 10, no. 7, doi:10.1038/S41557-018-0042-7, ISSN 1755-4330, (20180430), pages 715 - 723, (20180430), XP036530421 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * page 720; figures 2,3,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41557-018-0042-7 | by applicant | WO2004077062 | WO2006078161 | US2008269467 | WO2010062858 | WO2011018227 | WO2011141823 | WO2011163452 | WO2016067035 | WO2017191460 | - GAFFEN, SL, Arthritis Research & Therapy, (20040000), vol. 6, pages 240 - 247 | - SPRIGGS et al., J Clin Immunol, (19970000), vol. 17, pages 366 - 369 | - GAFFEN, SL, Nature Rev Immunol, (20090000), vol. 9, pages 556 - 567 | - DOREAU et al., Nature Immunology, (20090000), vol. 7, pages 778 - 7859 | - APPEL et al., Arthritis Research and Therapy, (20110000), vol. 13, page R95 | - MCLNNES et al., Arthritis & Rheumatism, (20110000), vol. 63, no. 10, page 779 | - JIZHANG, Cancer Immunol Immunother, (20100000), vol. 59, pages 979 - 987 | - ZHANG et al., J Hepatology, (20090000), vol. 50, pages 980 - 89 | - ZHU et al., Breast Cancer Research, (20080000), vol. 10, page R95 | - JIZHANG, Cancer Immunol Immuother, (20100000), vol. 59, pages 979 - 987 | - TUGYI et al., PNAS, (20050000), vol. 102, no. 2, pages 413 - 418 | - SCHREIBER et al., "Rapid, electrostatically assisted association of proteins", Nature Struct. Biol., (19960000), vol. 3, pages 427 - 31 | - GENTILUCCI et al., Curr. Pharmaceutical Design, (20100000), vol. 16, pages 3185 - 203 | - NESTOR et al., Curr. Medicinal Chem, (20090000), vol. 16, pages 4399 - 418 | - Pharmaceutical Salts: Properties, Selection, and Use, (20020800), page 388 | - CHENHARRISON, Biochemical Society Transactions, (20070000), vol. 35, no. 4, page 821 | - GUPTA et al., Advanced Drug Discovery Reviews, (20040000), vol. 57, page 9637 | - DEROSSI et al., J Biol. Chem., (19940000), vol. 269, page 10444 | - OEHLKE et al., Biochim Biophys Acts, (19980000), vol. 1414, page 127 | - OKUYAMA et al., Nature Methods, (20070000), vol. 4, page 153 | - ELSON-SCWAB et al., J Biol Chem, (20070000), vol. 282, page 13585 | - KELLOGG et al., Bioconjugate Chemistry, (20110000), vol. 22, page 717 | - LEFKOVITEPERNIS, Immunological Methods, Academic Press, (19790000), vol. I, II | GB20170020932 | WO2017EP83953 | WO2017EP83954 |