EP3784688 - HEAT SHOCK PROTEIN-BINDING PEPTIDE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agenus Inc. 3 Forbes Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINDEIS, Mark Arthur 431 School Street Belmont, Massachusetts 02478 / US | 02 /
MORIN, Benjamin Maxime 18 Gorham Street, Apt. 2 Somerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | 03 /
JOSHI, Bishnu 9 Captain Parker Arms, Apt. 02 Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons LLP (Munich), et al Lehel Carré Thierschplatz 6 80538 Munich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Pintsch, Tanja Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 19732758.8 | 25.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019US29112 | Priority number, date | US201862663083P | 26.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862663083 P | US201862692009P | 29.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862692009 P | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019210055 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3784688 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C07K14/005, C07K14/19, A61K39/00 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,KR,US);
C07K7/06 (KR,US);
A61K38/00 (KR);
A61K39/0011 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001114 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K47/646 (US);
A61K47/6901 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
C07K14/005 (KR);
C07K14/70539 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
A61K2039/5152 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/555 (KR);
A61K2039/55577 (EP);
A61K2039/585 (EP,KR);
A61K2039/6043 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/622 (US);
A61K2039/627 (US);
A61K2039/64 (US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | 24.11.2020 | ME | 24.11.2020 | Validation states | KH | 24.11.2020 | MA | 24.11.2020 | MD | 24.11.2020 | TN | 24.11.2020 | Title | German: | HITZESCHOCKPROTEINBINDENDE PEPTIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2021/09] | English: | HEAT SHOCK PROTEIN-BINDING PEPTIDE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2021/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PEPTIDIQUES DE LIAISON À UNE PROTÉINE DE CHOC THERMIQUE (HSP) ET LEURS MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 24.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/12] | 22.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/12] | Request for further processing for: | 13.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.09.2021 | Decision despatched | 13.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.09.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2021 | 30.04.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9922761 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US], et al); | [A]WO0152791 (UNIV CONNECTICUT HEALTH CT [US]); | [Y]WO2004071457 (MOJAVE THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2012126118 (ATLANTIC CANCER RES INST [CA], et al); | by applicant | US4877608 | US5137819 | US5202247 | US5328694 | US5496934 | WO9622107 | US5605884 | US5733873 | US5763401 | WO9961056 | US2001034042 | US2003232323 | US6808710 | US7309491 | US7332582 | US7488802 | US2009304679 | WO2010005958 | US2010203056 | US7943743 | US8008449 | US8114845 | US8168757 | US8168179 | US8217149 | US8354509 | WO2013033091 | US2013202623 | US8552154 | US2013266512 | US2013291136 | US2013323249 | WO2014022758 | US2014044738 | US8686119 | WO2014055897 | US2014134191 | US8735553 | US8747847 | WO2014100079 | US8779105 | US8779108 | WO2014179664 | US2014341917 | US2014356363 | WO2014209804 | WO2014206107 | US8927697 | US8981063 | WO2015036394 | US8993731 | WO2015058573 | WO2015061668 | WO2015085847 | US9074000 | US2015203580 | WO2015109124 | US9102727 | US2015225483 | US9175082 | US2015346208 | US9205148 | US2015355184 | WO2015195163 | WO2015200119 | WO2016000619 | WO2016015685 | WO2016020856 | WO2016030350 | US2016075783 | WO2016183486 | US2016331821 |