EP3802884 - METHODS FOR DEVELOPING URINE BIOMARKERS AND FOR DETECTING BLADDER CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exosome Diagnostics, Inc. 266 Second Avenue, Suite 200 Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITCHEN, Robert c/o Exosome Diagnostics,Inc. 266 Second Avenue,Suite 200 Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 02 /
CASTELLANOS-RIZALDOS, Elena c/o Exosome Diagnostics, Inc. 266 2nd Avenue Suite 200 Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 03 /
SHER, Mia c/o Exosome Diagnostics, Inc. 266 end Avenue Suite 200 Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 04 /
HURLEY, James c/o Exosome Diagnostics, Inc. 266 2nd Avenue Suite 200 Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 05 /
CHAN, Dalin c/o Exosome Diagnostics, Inc. 266 2nd Avenue Suite 200 Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 06 /
STOLL, Georg c/o Exosome Diagnostics, Inc. 266 2nd Avenue Suite 200 Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 07 /
YU, Wei c/o Exosome Diagnostics, Inc. 266 2nd Avenue Suite 200 Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 08 /
SKOG, Johan 120 Lexington Road Lexington Road Lincoln, Massachusetts 01773 / US | [2021/16] |
Former [2021/15] | 01 /
KITCHEN, Robert 28 Chetwynd Road Somerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | ||
02 /
CASTELLANOS-RIZALDOS, Elena c/o Exosome Diagnostics, Inc. 266 2nd Avenue Suite 200 Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | |||
03 /
SHER, Mia c/o Exosome Diagnostics, Inc. 266 end Avenue Suite 200 Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | |||
04 /
HURLEY, James c/o Exosome Diagnostics, Inc. 266 2nd Avenue Suite 200 Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | |||
05 /
CHAN, Dalin c/o Exosome Diagnostics, Inc. 266 2nd Avenue Suite 200 Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | |||
06 /
STOLL, Georg c/o Exosome Diagnostics, Inc. 266 2nd Avenue Suite 200 Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | |||
07 /
YU, Wei c/o Exosome Diagnostics, Inc. 266 2nd Avenue Suite 200 Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | |||
08 /
SKOG, Johan 120 Lexington Road Lexington Road Lincoln, Massachusetts 01773 / US | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19732839.6 | 06.06.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019US35800 | Priority number, date | US201862681636P | 06.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862681636 P | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019236853 | Date: | 12.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3802884 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6886 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTWICKLUNG VON URIN-BIOMARKERN UND ZUR DETEKTION VON BLASENKREBS | [2021/15] | English: | METHODS FOR DEVELOPING URINE BIOMARKERS AND FOR DETECTING BLADDER CANCER | [2021/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE DÉVELOPPEMENT DE BIOMARQUEURS URINAIRES ET DE DÉTECTION DU CANCER DE LA VESSIE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 08.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US7998695 (NAKAMURA YUSUKE [JP], et al); | [X]US2011262921 (SABICHI ANITA L [US], et al); | [X]US2013172203 (YEATMAN TIMOTHY [US], et al); | [X]WO2014138396 (CEPHEID [US]); | [X]US2015292030 (MCCONKEY DAVID [US], et al); | [XY]WO2017040520 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]WO2017214189 (ONCOCYTE CORP [US]); | by applicant | US5219727 | US5538871 | US5556773 | US5639606 | US6812023 | US6899863 | US7198923 | WO2009100029 | WO2014107571 | WO2016007755 |