EP3807401 - LIGANDS TO LIGHT OR ITS RECEPTOR LTßR FOR USE IN HAEMATOLOGIC MALIGNANCIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Bern Hochschulstrasse 6 3012 Bern / CH | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OCHSENBEIN, Adrian Breitenrain 28 3032 Hinterkappelen / CH | 02 /
HÖPPNER, Sabine Fabrikstrasse 20B 3012 Bern / CH | 03 /
RIETHER, Carsten Gesellschaftsstrasse 44 3012 Bern / CH | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Schulz Junghans Patentanwälte PartGmbB Großbeerenstraße 71 10963 Berlin / DE | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19732936.0 | 14.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019EP65780 | Priority number, date | EP20180178050 | 15.06.2018 Original published format: EP 18178050 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019238966 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3807401 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0789, A61K48/00, A61K39/00 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
C12N5/0647 (EP);
C07K16/2875 (US);
A61P35/02 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (US);
A01K2207/12 (EP);
A01K2217/075 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | LIGANDEN GEGEN LIGHT ODER DESSEN REZEPTOR LTSSR ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI HÄMATOLOGISCHEN MALIGNOMEN | [2021/16] | English: | LIGANDS TO LIGHT OR ITS RECEPTOR LTßR FOR USE IN HAEMATOLOGIC MALIGNANCIES | [2021/16] | French: | LIGANDS DE LIGHT OU DE SON RÉCEPTEUR LTßR DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS DANS DES MALIGNITÉS HÉMATOLOGIQUES | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 07.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US2011171242 (WARE CARL [US]) [X] 1-3,5,11 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0130] * [A] 6-10 [Y] 4; | [IY]WO2004031409 (ONCOTHERAPY SCIENCE INC [JP], et al) [I] 1-11 * page 41; table 3 * * claims 1, 18, 23-25 * * page 24, paragraph 2 * [Y] 1-11; | [Y]US2006134102 (LEPAGE DOREEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0119] * * page 23; example 3 *; | [A]EP0954333 (BIOGEN INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010046289 (UNIV ZUERICH PROREKTORAT MNW [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 4 - page 7; claims 1-15 *; | [A]EP2157981 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9902563 (JOLLA INST ALLERGY IMMUNOLOG [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9817313 (BIOGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - ZHAI Y ET AL, "LIGHT, A NOVEL LIGAND FOR LYMPHOTOXIN BETA RECEPTOR AND TR2/HVEM INDUCES APOPTOSIS AND SUPPRESSES IN VIVO TUMOR FORMATION VIA GENE TRANSFER", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION,, (19980901), vol. 102, no. 6, doi:10.1172/JCI3492, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 1142 - 1151, XP002947576 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI3492 | by applicant | US2012142611 | US2016250341 | US2016075767 | US2015368302 | US2011165621 | - SCHUETTPELZ, L.G.LINK, D.C. et al., Frontiers in immunology, (20130000), vol. 4 | - VINCKE et al., "General strategy to humanize a camelid single-domain antibody and identification of a universal humanized nanobody scaffold", J Biol Chem., (20090130), vol. 284, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M806889200, pages 3273 - 3284, XP009124408 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M806889200 | - FUTTERER, A.MINK, K.LUZ, A.KOSCO-VILBOIS, M.H.PFEFFER, K., Immunity, (19980000), vol. 9, pages 59 - 70 | - MUMPRECHT, S.SCHURCH, C.SCHWALLER, J.SOLENTHALER, M.OCHSENBEIN, A.F., Blood, (20090000), vol. 114, pages 5191 - 5200 | - SCHEPERS, K. et al., Cell stem cell, (20130000), vol. 13, pages 285 - 299 | - SCHEPERS, K.HSIAO, E.C.GARG, T.SCOTT, M.J.PASSEGUE, E., Blood, (20120000), vol. 120, pages 3425 - 3435 | - WILSON, A. et al., Annals of the New York Academy of Sciences, (20070000), vol. 1106, pages 64 - 75 | - SCHURCH, C.RIETHER, C.MATTER, M.S.TZANKOV, A.OCHSENBEIN, A.F., The Journal of clinical investigation, (20120000), vol. 122, pages 624 - 638 | - RIETHER, C. et al., The Journal of experimental medicine, (20170000), vol. 214, pages 359 - 380 | - RADPOUR, R. et al., PloS one, (20110000), vol. 6, page e27355 | - WONG, C.C. et al., Nature biotechnology, (20100000), vol. 28, pages 1115 - 1121 | - UNTERGASSER, A. et al., Nucleic acids research, (20070000), vol. 35, pages W71 - 74 | - LIVAK, K.J.SCHMITTGEN, T.D., Methods, (20010000), vol. 25, pages 402 - 408 | - PANG, W.W. et al., Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America, (20110000), vol. 108, no. 50, pages 20012 - 20017 | - REBEL, V.I. et al., Journal of Experimental Medicine, (19990000), vol. 190, no. 10, pages 1493 - 504 |