EP3810218 - STATOR VANE DEVICE FOR GUIDING THE FLOW OF A FLUID FLOWING OUT OF AN OUTLET OPENING OF A VENTRICULAR ASSIST DEVICE, VENTRICULAR ASSIST DEVICE WITH STATOR VANE DEVICE, METHOD FOR OPERATING A STATOR VANE DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kardion GmbH Quellenstrasse 7 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOTZ, Ingo Schubartstrasse 7 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 02 /
BETTE, Johannes Schwabstrasse 32 71229 Leonberg / DE | 03 /
SCHUELKE, Armin Schulstrasse 6 71134 Aidlingen / DE | 04 /
MINZENMAY, David Viereichenweg 16 70569 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Gauss, Nikolai, et al Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB Tübingerstraße 26 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19733456.8 | 21.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019EP66499 | Priority number, date | DE201810210058 | 21.06.2018 Original published format: DE102018210058 | [2021/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019243588 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810218 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3810218 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M60/135, A61M60/205 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
A61M60/403 (EP,US);
A61M60/221 (EP,US);
A61M60/139 (EP);
A61M60/178 (US);
A61M60/237 (EP,US);
A61M60/812 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0266 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | A61M1/10, A61M1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STATORSCHAUFELVORRICHTUNG ZUR STRÖMUNGSFÜHRUNG EINES AUS EINER AUSTRITTSÖFFNUNG EINES HERZUNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEMS AUSSTRÖMENDEN FLUIDS, HERZUNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM MIT STATORSCHAUFELVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER STATORSCHAUFELVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLVERFAHREN | [2021/17] | English: | STATOR VANE DEVICE FOR GUIDING THE FLOW OF A FLUID FLOWING OUT OF AN OUTLET OPENING OF A VENTRICULAR ASSIST DEVICE, VENTRICULAR ASSIST DEVICE WITH STATOR VANE DEVICE, METHOD FOR OPERATING A STATOR VANE DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2021/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PALE DE STATOR POUR LE GUIDAGE DU FLUX D'UN FLUIDE S'ÉCOULANT D'UN ORIFICE DE SORTIE D'UN SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE VENTRICULAIRE, SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE VENTRICULAIRE POURVU DU DISPOSITIF DE PALE DE STATOR, PROCÉDÉ POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE PALE DE STATOR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 23.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2019 | AL | 06.04.2022 | CY | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | MK | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SE | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | TR | 06.04.2022 | LU | 21.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 21.06.2019 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
MK | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 21.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
MK | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 21.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 21.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 21.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 21.06.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | DK | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2013167432 (ABIOMED EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 13, line 10 - line 17 *; | [XI]US8690749 (NUNEZ ANTHONY [US]) [X] 1-6,8-25,27 * abstract * * column 6, line 25 - line 47 * [I] 7; | [A]US2017333608 (ZENG ZIJING [US]) [A] 1 * abstract ** paragraphs [0125] , [0126] * |