EP3807272 - BIFUNCTIONAL MOLECULES FOR TARGETING RPN11 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amphista Therapeutics Ltd The Cori Building Granta Park Great Abington, Cambridge CB21 6GQ / GB | [2023/04] |
Former [2021/16] | For all designated states Amphista Therapeutics Ltd 158-160 North Gower Street London NW1 2ND / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIULLI, Alessio 11 Step Row Dundee DD2 1AF / GB | 02 /
TESTA, Andrea c/o Amphista Therapeutics Ltd. Bo'Ness Road Newhouse, North Lanarkshire ML1 5UH / GB | 03 /
HUGHES, Scott c/o Amphista Therapeutics Ltd. Bo'Ness Road Newhouse, North Lanarkshire ML1 5UH / GB | 04 /
BUTCHER, Steven Peter 23 Spaldwick Road Stow Longa Huntingdon, Cambridgeshire PE28 0TL / GB | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Goodacre, Jonathan David Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | Rudkin, Mairi Ellen Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19733978.1 | 13.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019EP65481 | Priority number, date | US201862684265P | 13.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862684265 P | US201962835953P | 18.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962835953 P | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019238817 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3807272 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/14, C07D495/14, C07D417/12, A61K31/4439, A61K31/444, A61K31/506, A61K31/5517, A61P7/06, A61P35/00 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
C07D495/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/60 (US);
A61K31/277 (US);
A61K31/351 (US);
A61K31/404 (US);
A61K31/407 (US);
A61K31/4184 (US);
A61K31/423 (US);
A61K31/428 (US);
A61K31/4375 (US);
A61K31/44 (US);
A61K31/47 (US);
A61K31/4709 (US);
A61K31/496 (US);
A61K31/506 (US);
A61K31/519 (US);
A61K31/5355 (US);
A61K31/551 (US);
A61K47/55 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/555 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | BIFUNKTIONALE MOLEKÜLE ZUM TARGETING VON RPN11 | [2021/16] | English: | BIFUNCTIONAL MOLECULES FOR TARGETING RPN11 | [2021/16] | French: | MOLÉCULES BIFONCTIONNELLES POUR CIBLER RPN11 | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 24.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9320094 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [X] 1-7,15-30,38,39,44-47 * examples 4, 6, 9 10, 14-29; claims 15-21, 24, 25, 37, 38 *; | [Y]US5521184 (ZIMMERMANN JUERG [CH]) [Y] 1-7,15-30,38-47 * example 21; claims 1-23 *; | [Y]WO0062778 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [Y] 1-7,15-30,38-47 * claims 1-58; compounds 455, 457 *; | [Y]EP2199283 (KOWA CO [JP]) [Y] 1-7,15-30,38-47 * Compounds 8, 15, 27, 41-43, 45, 54, 93, 95, 97, 100, 113-121;; claims 1-20 *; | [A]WO2017031255 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]) [A] 1-7,15-30,38-47 * claims 1-20 *; | [X]WO2017046036 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE IP DEV LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7,15-30,38,39,44-47 * examples 1, 13, 23, 26; claims 1-20 *; | [X]WO2017182418 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE IP DEV LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7,15-30,38,39,44-47 * page 89 last compound, page 90 first compound, page 97 the two compounds, page 142 first compound;; claims 1-18 *; | [X] - DANIEL P BONDESON ET AL, "Catalytic in vivo protein knockdown by small-molecule PROTACs", NATURE CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (20150101), vol. 11, no. 8, pages 611 - 617, XP055621789 [X] 1-7,15-30,38,39,44-47 * PROTAC_RIPK2; page 612; figures 1-5 * | [Y] - PANAGIS FILIPPAKOPOULOS ET AL, "Selective inhibition of BET bromodomains", NATURE, London, (20101201), vol. 468, no. 7327, doi:10.1038/nature09504, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 1067 - 1073, XP055589157 [Y] 1-7,15-30,38-47 * figures 1-5; compounds JQ-1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09504 | by applicant | US4522811 | WO0222577 | US6468798 | US7208157 | US2010137254 | US2010183742 | WO2012078559 | WO2013106643 | US2016176916 | WO2016146985 | WO2017024318 | WO2017024317 | WO2017024319 | US2017050931 | US9670482 | - BULATOV et al., Biochem J., (20150000), vol. 467, pages 365 - 386 | - LI et al., PLOS One, (20080000), vol. 3, page 1487 | - BERNDSEN et al., Nat. Struct. Mol. Biol., (20140000), vol. 21, pages 301 - 307 | - DESHAIES et al., Ann. Rev. Biochem., (20090000), vol. 78, pages 399 - 434 | - SPRATT et al., Biochem., (20140000), vol. 458, pages 421 - 437 | - WANG et al., Nat. Rev. Cancer.,, (20140000), vol. 14, pages 233 - 347 | - OTTIS, P.CREWS, C. M., "Proteolysis-Targeting Chimeras: Induced Protein Degradation as a Therapeutic Strategy", ACS Chem Biol, (20170000), vol. 12, pages 892 - 898 | - HOGAN et al., Handbook Of Experimental Immunology, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory Press, (19860000), vol. I-IV | - PEREZ et al., J. Med. Chem., (20170000), vol. 60, pages 1343 - 1361 | - FINNIN, M. S. et al., "Structures of Histone Deacetylase Homologue Bound to the TSA and SAHA Inhibitors", Nature, (19990000), vol. 40, doi:doi:10.1038/43710, pages 188 - 193, XP002266214 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/43710 | - O' CONNOR et al., Nat Protoc., (20160400), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 781 - 94 | - SUN et al., Clin Cancer Res., (20120201), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 758 - 70 | - SCHENKEL et al., "Discovery of Potent and Highly Selective Thienopyridine Janus Kinase 2 Inhibitors", J. Med. Chem., (20110000), vol. 54, no. 24, doi:doi:10.1021/jm200911r, pages 8440 - 8450, XP055043479 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm200911r | - SUN et al., Mol. Pharmaceutics, (20180000), vol. 15, pages 3343 - 3355 | - ZHANG et al., European Journal of Pharmaceutics and Biopharmaceutics, (20180000), vol. 128, pages 260 - 271 | - MCCAFFERTY et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - TSUCHIKAMA et al., Protein Cell, (20180000), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 33 - 46 | - WANG et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20140000), vol. 136, pages 2731 - 2734 | - JONES et al., "Small-Molecule Kinase Downregulators", Cell Chem. Biol., (20170000), vol. 25, pages 30 - 35 | - ROMERO, F.A.TAYLOR, A.M.CRAWFORD, T. D.TSUI, V.COTE, A.MAGNUSON, S., "Disrupting Acetyl-Lysine Recognition: Progress in the Development of Bromodomain Inhibitors", J. Med. Chem., (20160000), vol. 59, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b01514, pages 1271 - 1298, XP055302035 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b01514 | - MILLAN et al., "Design and Synthesis of Inhaled P38 Inhibitors for the Treatment of Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disease", Med. Chem., (20110000), vol. 54, doi:doi:10.1021/jm200677b, page 7797, XP055150024 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm200677b | - VAN EIS et al., "2,6-Naphthyridines as potent and selective inhibitors of the novel protein kinase C isozymes", Biorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20111200), vol. 21, no. 24, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2011.10.025, pages 7367 - 72, XP028113889 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2011.10.025 | - LOUNTOS et al., "Structural Characterization of Inhibitor Complexes with Checkpoint Kinase 2 (Chk2), a Drug Target for Cancer Therapy", J. Struct.. Biol., (20110000), vol. 176, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jsb.2011.09.008, page 292, XP028104277 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jsb.2011.09.008 | - LOUNTOS et al., "Structural Characterization of Inhibitor Complexes with Checkpoint Kinase 2 (Chk2), a Drug Target for Cancer Therapy", J. Struct. Biol., (20110000), vol. 176292 | - HEWINGS et al., "3,5-Dimethylisoxazoles Act as Acetyl-lysine Bromodomain Ligands", J. Med. Chem., (20110000), vol. 54, doi:doi:10.1021/jm200640v, pages 6761 - 6770, XP002689396 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm200640v | - VASSILEV et al., "In vivo activation of the p53 pathway by small-molecule antagonists of MDM2", Science, (20040000), pages 303844 - 848 | - SCHNEEKLOTH et al., "Targeted intracellular protein degradation induced by a small molecule: En route to chemicalproteomics", Biorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20080000), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2008.07.114, pages 5904 - 5908, XP025627166 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2008.07.114 | - VALLEE et al., "Tricyclic Series of Heat Shock Protein 90 (HSP90) Inhibitors Part I: Discovery of Tricyclic Imidazo [4,5-C] Pyridines as Potent Inhibitors of the HSP90 Molecular Chaperone", Med. Chem., (20110000), vol. 54, doi:doi:10.1021/jm200784m, page 7206, XP055240728 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm200784m | - BROUGH et al., "4,5-Diarylisoxazole HSP90 Chaperone Inhibitors: Potential Therapeutic Agents for the Treatment of Cancer", Med. Chem., (20080000), vol. 51, page 196 | - WRIGHT et al., "Structure- Activity Relationships in Purine-Based Inhibitor Binding to HSP90 Isoforms", Chem Biol., (20040600), vol. 11, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.chembiol.2004.03.033, pages 775 - 85, XP025940200 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2004.03.033 | - CHANG et al., "Structural Basis for G9a-Like protein Lysine Methyltransferase Inhibition by BIX-1294", Nat. Struct. Biol., (20090000), vol. 16, no. 3, page 312 | - LIU, F. et al., "Discovery of a 2,4-Diamino-7-aminoalkoxyquinazoline as a Potent and Selective Inhibitor of Histone Methyltransferase G9a", J. Med. Chem., (20090000), vol. 52, no. 24, doi:doi:10.1021/jm901543m, page 7950, XP002702501 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm901543m | - SAKAMOTO et al., "Development of Protacs to target cancer-promoting proteins for ubiquitination and degradation", Mol. Cell Proteomics, (20031200), vol. 2, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1074/mcp.T300009-MCP200, pages 1350 - 1358, XP055039869 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/mcp.T300009-MCP200 | - RODRIGUEZ-GONZALEZ et al., "Targeting steroid hormone receptors for ubiquitination and degradation in breast and prostate cancer", Oncogene, (20080000), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1038/onc.2008.320, pages 7201 - 7211, XP055001566 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/onc.2008.320 | - SAKAMOTO et al., "Protacs: chimeric molecules that target proteins to the Skpl- Cullin-F box complex for ubiquitination and degradation", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20010700), vol. 98, no. 15, pages 8554 - 8559 | - SCHNEEKLOTH et al., "Chemical Genetic Control of Protein Levels: Selective in Vivo Targeted Degradation", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20040000), vol. 126, doi:doi:10.1021/ja039025z, pages 3748 - 3754, XP008141514 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja039025z | - LEE et al., "Targeted Degradation of the Aryl Hydrocarbon Receptor by the PROTAC Approach: A Useful Chemical Genetic Tool", ChemBioChem, (20071123), vol. 8, no. 17, pages 2058 - 2062 | - BOITANO et al., "Aryl Hydrocarbon Receptor Antagonists Promote the Expansion of Human Hematopoietic Stem Cells", Science, (20100900), vol. 329, no. 5997, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1191536, pages 1345 - 1348, XP055545288 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1191536 | - J. Med. Chem., (20100000), vol. 53, pages 6466 - 538 | - Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20110000), vol. 50, pages 9838 - 9842 | - MCCAFFREY et al., Nature, (20020000), vol. 418, no. 6893, pages 38 - 9 | - XIA et al., Nature Biotechnol., (20020000), vol. 20, no. 10, pages 1006 - 10 | - PUTNAM, Am. J. Health Syst. Pharm., (19960000), vol. 53, no. 3, pages 325 - 160 | - WESTERFIELD, M., The zebrafish book. A guide for the laboratory use of zebrafish (Danio rerio, Univ. of Oregon Press, (20000000), vol. 154 and 155 | WO2012US63401 | WO2015US25813 |