EP3806877 - PROBIOTIC COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROBI AB Ideongatan 1A 223 70 Lund / SE | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSSON, Niklas Probi AB Ideongatan 1A SE-223 70 Lund / SE | 02 /
LAZOU AHRÉN, Irini Probi AB Ideongatan 1A SE-223 70 Lund / SE | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19733982.3 | 13.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019EP65588 | Priority number, date | GB20180009947 | 18.06.2018 Original published format: GB 201809947 | GB20190005389 | 16.04.2019 Original published format: GB 201905389 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019243168 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3806877 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/747, A61P19/10 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
A61K35/747 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/59 (KR);
A61K31/593 (US);
A61P19/10 (EP,KR,US);
C12N1/20 (KR);
C12R2001/225 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | PROBIOTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR | [2021/16] | English: | PROBIOTIC COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF | [2021/16] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PROBIOTIQUES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/16] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 15.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO2014163568 (PROBI AB [SE]) [XD] 1-3,6,8,10-15,17-20 * page 4, lines 1-6; examples 1-34; claims 1-9; table 2 * [I] 1-20; | [A] - SHEN-SHIH CHIANG ET AL, "Antiosteoporotic Effects of Lactobacillus -Fermented Soy Skim Milk on Bone Mineral Density and the Microstructure of Femoral Bone in Ovariectomized Mice", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, US, (20110727), vol. 59, no. 14, doi:10.1021/jf2013716, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 7734 - 7742, XP055489729 [A] 1-20 * abstract;; figures 2-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf2013716 | [A] - CHIANG S S ET AL, "Effect of bioactive compounds in lactobacilli-fermented soy skim milk on femoral bone microstructure of aging mice", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, WILEY & SONS, CHICHESTER, GB, (20120101), vol. 92, no. 2, doi:10.1002/JSFA.4579, ISSN 0022-5142, pages 328 - 335, XP002761259 [A] 1-20 * abstract;; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jsfa.4579 | [X] - OHLSSON CLAES ET AL, "Probiotics Protect Mice from Ovariectomy-Induced Cortical Bone Loss", PLOS ONE, PUBLIC LIBRARY OF SCIENCE, US, (20140301), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 1932-6203, pages 1 - 8, XP002761260 [X] 1,13-15,17-20 * abstract;; table 2 * | [A] - FRASER L. COLLINS ET AL, "The Potential of Probiotics as a Therapy for Osteoporosis", MICROBIOLOGY SPECTRUM, (20170801), vol. 5, no. 4, doi:10.1128/microbiolspec.BAD-0015-2016, XP055625516 [A] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/microbiolspec.BAD-0015-2016 | by applicant | WO03026687 | US8007777 | US8540980 | WO2014163568 | WO2016003870 | WO2017060477 | WO2018224509 | - Lancet, (20100515), vol. 375, no. 9727, pages 1729 - 36 | - MCDONNELL et al., Ann Biomed Eng, (20070000), vol. 35, no. 2, pages 170 - 189 | - MILZPUTZ, "Quantitative morphology of the subchondral plate of the tibial plateau", J Anat, (19940000), vol. 185, pages 103 - 110 | - HILL et al., Nat Rev Gastroenterol Hepatol, (20140000), vol. 11, no. 8, pages 506 - 514 | - ARIJMAND, Sci Rep, (20190000), vol. 8, no. 1, page 11478 | - Remington: The Science and Practice of Pharmacy, Mack Publishing Company, (19950000), vol. 1 & 2 | - ELLEKILDE et al., Sci Rep, (20140000), vol. 4, page 5922 | - REIKVAM et al., PLoS One, (20110000), vol. 6, no. 3, page e17996 | - VAN 'T HOF, "Analysis of bone architecture in rodents using microcomputed tomography", Methods Mol Biol, (20120000), vol. 816, pages 461 - 476 | - BOUXSEIN et al., "Guidelines for assessment of bone microstructure in rodents using micro-computed tomography", J Bone Miner Res, (20100000), vol. 25, pages 1468 - 1486 | - CAMPBELLSOPHOCLEOUS, "Quantitative analysis of bone structure by micro-computed tomography", BoneKEy Reports, (20140000), vol. 3, page 564 | - SOPHOCLEOUS et al., "The type 2 cannabinoid receptor regulates susceptibility to osteoarthritis in mice", Osteoarthr Cartil, (20150000), vol. 23, pages 1585 - 1594 | GB20170008932 |