EP3813961 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PIPE ELEMENT, PARTICULARLY A PIPE ELEMENT OF A FIRE-EXTINGUISHING FACILITY, PIPE ELEMENT AND PIPE SYSTEM COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | 27.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minimax Viking Patent Management GmbH Industriestraße 10/12 23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE | [2024/44] |
Former [2021/18] | For all designated states Minimax Viking Research & Development GmbH Industriestraße 10/12 23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖNPAGEL, Andreas Industriestraße 10/12 23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19734075.5 | 27.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019EP67106 | Priority number, date | DE201810115506 | 27.06.2018 Original published format: DE102018115506 | [2021/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020002486 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3813961 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3813961 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A62C35/68, F16L41/08, F16L58/10, F16L13/02 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
A62C35/68 (EP,US);
B23K9/02 (US);
F16L13/02 (EP,US);
F16L41/082 (EP,US);
F16L58/1009 (EP,US);
B23K2101/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES ROHRLEITUNGSELEMENTS, INSBESONDERE EINES ROHRLEITUNGSELEMENTS EINER FEUERLÖSCHANLAGE, ROHRLEITUNGSELEMENT UND ROHRLEITUNGSSYSTEM IM SELBIGEN | [2021/18] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PIPE ELEMENT, PARTICULARLY A PIPE ELEMENT OF A FIRE-EXTINGUISHING FACILITY, PIPE ELEMENT AND PIPE SYSTEM COMPRISING SAME | [2021/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE CONDUITE TUBULAIRE, EN PARTICULIER D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE CONDUITE TUBULAIRE D'UNE INSTALLATION D'EXTINCTION DE FEU, ÉLÉMENT DE CONDUITE TUBULAIRE ET SYSTÈME DE CONDUITE TUBULAIRE DANS CELUI-CI | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 27.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002195426 (VASUDEVA KAILASH C [CA], et al) [Y] 12,28,30* paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP2623163 (MINIMAX GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 14-20,31-34,38-40 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029]; figure 1 *; | [YA]DE102016001294 (GODOW BURKHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3,7-20 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-3 * [A] 4-6; | [XAY]US2018031152 (RAJAGOPALAN SHANKAR T [US], et al) [X] 21-24,27,29,35-37 * paragraph [0215] - paragraph [0592]; figures 1-2 * [A] 4-6,25,26 [Y] 1-3,7-20,28,30-34,38-40 | Examination | DE1627629 | EP0402648 | US2012111837 | by applicant | EP2153964 | EP2766653 |