|
30.11.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.08.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.08.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
06.08.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
09.07.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2021 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2021 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2021 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2021 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2021 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.01.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.01.2021 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.12.2020 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
28.08.2020 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.08.2020 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.08.2020 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Invitation to pay prescribed fees together with late payment fee (Rule 58bis PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.11.2019 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
23 |
|
12.11.2019 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.11.2019 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
12.11.2019 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.11.2019 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.11.2019 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.10.2019 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
19 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |