EP3814653 - JUNCTION DEVICE FOR CONVEYOR BELT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FP Business Invest Rue Michel Rondet ZI du Clos Marquet 42400 Saint-Chamond / FR | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAVERNIER, Bernard c/o FP BUSINESS INVEST rue Michel Rondet ZI du Clos Marquet 42400 SAINT-CHAMOND / FR | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Bringer IP 1, Place du Président Thomas Wilson 31000 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/37] | Alatis 3, rue Paul Escudier 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2021/18] | Alatis 3 rue Paul Escudier 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 19734353.6 | 25.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019EP66913 | Priority number, date | FR20180055731 | 26.06.2018 Original published format: FR 1855731 | [2021/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020002378 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3814653 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3814653 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16G3/08, D03D47/02 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
F16G3/08 (EP,IL,US);
D03D47/02 (EP);
D03D5/00 (EP);
F16G3/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 14.01.2021 | TN | 14.01.2021 | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FÖRDERBAND | [2021/18] | English: | JUNCTION DEVICE FOR CONVEYOR BELT | [2021/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE JONCTION POUR BANDE TRANSPORTEUSE | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 14.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 13.12.2023 | |
GR | 14.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2210065 (TEXTILMA AG [CH]); | [Y]FR2706964 (ASER SARL [FR]); | [AD]EP1163459 (ASER SARL [FR]); | [Y]US2004040610 (SPEICH FRANCISCO [CH], et al) | Examination | EP1163459 | by applicant | EP0827575 | EP1163459 |