EP3792421 - ASSEMBLY OF BUILDING BLOCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martin Lozano, Pablo Enrique Av. Del Libertador 2254, Piso 18 Buenos Aires, CP 1425 / AR | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Inchingalo, Simona Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19734501.0 | 10.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019IB53874 | Priority number, date | AR2018P101223 | 10.05.2018 Original published format: AR P180101223 | [2021/11] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019215692 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | ES | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3792421 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3792421 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/50, E04B2/22 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
E04B2/22 (EP);
E04B2/50 (EP);
E04B2002/0297 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENBAU VON BAUSTEINEN | [2021/11] | English: | ASSEMBLY OF BUILDING BLOCKS | [2021/11] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE BLOCS DE CONSTRUCTION | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2019 | Translation filed | 09.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 09.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/25] | EE | 05.07.2023 | |
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
GR | 06.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]BE434063 (W.FEITH; J.SCHWARZBART;J.FISCHER) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [X]US1696992 (WHITACRE JOHN J) [X] 1-3,7,12,14,15 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2476719 (GRANGER PATRICIA [FR]) [A] 1,3-5 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2572108 (RECH STE CIVILE ET [FR]) [X] 1,2,16 * page 3, lines 20-37 * * page 4, lines 10-38; figure - *; | [X]WO9602712 (LEE CASWOLD HICKSON [AU]) [X] 1 * page 7, lines 29-35; figures 3,4 *; | [X]WO9836136 (HANDELMAN JOSEPH H [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,7 *; | [AD]EP2520731 (MARTIN LOZANO PABLO [AR])[AD] 8 |