EP3821253 - A METHOD OF DETECTING THE PRESENCE OF A BIOMARKER IN A SAMPLE OF A FLOWABLE SUBSTANCE, A DETECTOR ASSEMBLY FOR USE IN THE DETECTION OF A BIOMARKER IN A SAMPLE OF A FLOWABLE SUBSTANCE AND A DETECTOR UNIT FOR USE IN THE DETECTION OF THE PRESENCE OF A BIOMARKER IN A SAMPLE OF A FLOWABLE SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calmark Sweden Aktiebolag Karlstad Innovation Park Sommargatan 101A 656 37 Karlstad / SE | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SÖDERLUND, Anna Hjälmarsvägen 15 120 53 Årsta / SE | 02 /
CORREIA, Tania St Eriksgatan 67 113 32 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
ÅBJÖRNSSON, Anders Olof skötkonungs gata 36 253 62 Helsingborg / SE | 04 /
SVANH, Johan Lärbro Stora Hammars 2854 624 53 Lärbro / SE | 05 /
MOREIRA PINHO, Catarina Tollareslingan 20, LGH 0602 132 49 Saltsjö-Boo / SE | 06 /
DE ARAÚJO SILVA, Ana Catarina Serenadvägen 17A 131 53 Nacka / SE | 07 /
LUNDH, Michael Iliongränden 320 224 71 Lund / SE | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Bjerkén Hynell KB P.O. Box 1061 101 39 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | Hynell Intellectual Property AB Hammarbybacken 27 120 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19734760.2 | 27.06.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019EP67198 | Priority number, date | SE20180050879 | 10.07.2018 Original published format: SE 1850879 | SE20180050880 | 10.07.2018 Original published format: SE 1850880 | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020011552 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821253 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, A61B5/1455, G01N33/72 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
G01N33/68 (EP);
G01N33/726 (EP,US);
B01L3/502715 (US);
B01L2200/06 (EP,US);
B01L2300/027 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS DER ANWESENHEIT EINES BIOMARKERS IN EINER PROBE EINER FLIESSFÄHIGEN SUBSTANZ, DETEKTORANORDNUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG BEIM NACHWEIS EINES BIOMARKERS IN EINER PROBE EINER FLIESSFÄHIGEN SUBSTANZ UND DETEKTOREINHEIT ZUR VERWENDUNG BEIM NACHWEIS DER ANWESENHEIT EINES BIOMARKERS IN EINER PROBE EINER FLIESSFÄHIGEN SUBSTANZ | [2021/20] | English: | A METHOD OF DETECTING THE PRESENCE OF A BIOMARKER IN A SAMPLE OF A FLOWABLE SUBSTANCE, A DETECTOR ASSEMBLY FOR USE IN THE DETECTION OF A BIOMARKER IN A SAMPLE OF A FLOWABLE SUBSTANCE AND A DETECTOR UNIT FOR USE IN THE DETECTION OF THE PRESENCE OF A BIOMARKER IN A SAMPLE OF A FLOWABLE SUBSTANCE | [2021/20] | French: | MÉTHODE DE DÉTECTION DE LA PRÉSENCE D'UN BIOMARQUEUR DANS UN ÉCHANTILLON D'UNE SUBSTANCE FLUIDE, COMPRENANT UN ENSEMBLE DÉTECTEUR À UTILISER DANS LA DÉTECTION D'UN BIOMARQUEUR DANS UN ÉCHANTILLON D'UNE SUBSTANCE FLUIDE ET UNITÉ DE DÉTECTION À UTILISER DANS LA DÉTECTION DE LA PRÉSENCE D'UN BIOMARQUEUR DANS UN ÉCHANTILLON D'UNE SUBSTANCE FLUIDE | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 15.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0070350 (CME TELEMETRIX INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-20 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO03020424 (PROVALIS DIAGNOSTICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-20 * figure -; claims 1-5 *; | [I]US2004156037 (MAWHIRT JAMES A [US], et al) [I] 1-20* figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO2005086744 (METRIKA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0144]; figure -; claim - *; | [I]US2006222567 (KLOEPFER HANS G [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0095]; figures 6-9 *; | [A]US2014329262 (KARLSSON MATHIAS [SE], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0042]; figure -; claim - *; | [AD]EP2875866 (SHARP KK [JP]) [AD] 1-20 * abstract *; | [I]WO2016176366 (UNIV MARYLAND [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * page 4 - page 7; figure 5A and 5B; claim - *; | [XDP]WO2018130506 (CALMARK SWEDEN AB [SE]) [XDP] 1-20 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | US4671381 | US5147606 | US9283560 | SE20170050028 | WO2018EP50424 |